This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/07/2018 at 11:32:56 (UTC).

Heritage Pacific Financial, LLC vs. Juan Vite Marquez

Case Summary

On 04/30/2010 Heritage Pacific Financial, LLC filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against Juan Vite Marquez. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, South County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************R-SC

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HERITAGE PACIFIC FINANCIAL LLC; DBA : HERITAGE PACIFIC FINANCIAL

Defendants

GARIBAY, ANTONIO ANGUIANO

MOREHEAD, THOMAS G

FELIX, DANIEL MORA

DE HERRERA, OLGA GONZALEZ

GONZALEZ JR, BENJAMIN

GARAVITO, MARTHA

MARQUEZ, JUAN VITE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUPE, JENNIFER N

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF MOKRI & ASSOCIATES

1851 E First Street 900

Santa Ana, CA 92705

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing SD

OSC - Failure to File Certificate of Service scheduled for 11/02/2010 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for OSC - Failure to File Certificate of Service heard 11/02/2010 08:30:00 AM.

Notice of Hearing SD

OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed scheduled for 12/09/2010 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed heard 12/09/2010 08:30:00 AM.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed heard 12/09/2010 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2010
  • Court ordered entire action dismissed without prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2010
  • Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed by Heritage Pacific Financial LLC. Refers to: Marquez, Juan; Felix, Daniel; Gonzalez, Benjamin; Garibay, Antonio; Garavito, Martha; De Herrera, Olga; Morehead, Thomas Filed By: Heritage Pacific Financial LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed scheduled for 12/09/2010 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for OSC - Failure to File Certificate of Service heard 11/02/2010 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2010
  • The default filed by Heritage Pacific Financial LLC was entered as to Gonzalez, Benjamin Jr; Garavito, Martha on Complaint . Override feature used.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2010
  • Request for Entry of Default filed by Heritage Pacific Financial LLC. Refers to: Gonzalez, Benjamin Filed By: Heritage Pacific Financial LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2010
  • Request for Entry of Default filed by Heritage Pacific Financial LLC. Refers to: Garavito, Martha Filed By: Heritage Pacific Financial LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • OSC - Failure to File Certificate of Service scheduled for 11/02/2010 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2010
  • Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed by Heritage Pacific Financial LLC. Refers to: Marquez, Juan Filed By: Heritage Pacific Financial LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2010
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Heritage Pacific Financial, LLC. Refers to: Gonzalez, Benjamin Filed By: Heritage Pacific Financial LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2010
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Heritage Pacific Financial, LLC. Refers to: Garavito, Martha Filed By: Heritage Pacific Financial LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2010
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Heritage Pacific Financial, LLC. Refers to: Garibay, Antonio Filed By: Heritage Pacific Financial LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2010
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Heritage Pacific Financial, LLC. Refers to: De Herrera, Olga Filed By: Heritage Pacific Financial LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2010
  • Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed by Heritage Pacific Financial, LLC. Refers to: Morehead, Thomas Filed By: Heritage Pacific Financial LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2010
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2010
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Cannon, William.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2010
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2010
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Heritage Pacific Financial, LLC. Refers to: Marquez, Juan; Felix, Daniel; Gonzalez, Benjamin; Garibay, Antonio; Garavito, Martha; De Herrera, Olga; Morehead, Thomas Filed By: Heritage Pacific Financial LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2010
  • Complaint filed by Heritage Pacific Financial, LLC. Refers to: Marquez, Juan; Felix, Daniel; Gonzalez, Benjamin; Garibay, Antonio; Garavito, Martha; De Herrera, Olga; Morehead, Thomas Filed By: Heritage Pacific Financial LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.