This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/09/2022 at 08:07:41 (UTC).

Hepworth vs Kahn

Case Summary

On 12/09/2021 Hepworth filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Kahn. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is John S. Meyer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

John S. Meyer

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Hepworth, Jessica

Hepworth, Nick

Defendants and Cross Defendants

GREEN HOME & YARD

HKT CAL INC; DBA : KELLER WILLIAMS REALTY

KAHN, KARL

SMITH, JOSHUA

Moreno, Adolfo

Terra Nova Realty

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

HKT CAL INC; DBA : KELLER WILLIAMS REALTY

SMITH, JOSHUA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brick, Jon S.

One America Plaza, 600 W Broadway #960

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

Trester, Fredric W

Attorney at MANNING & KASS ELLROD RAMIREZ & TRESTER LLP

801 S Figueroa Street 15Th Fl

Los Angeles, CA 90017

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Hepworth, Nick; Hepworth, Jessica.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Hepworth, Nick; Hepworth, Jessica.

Complaint

Complaint filed by Hepworth, Nick; Hepworth, Jessica. Refers to: KAHN, KARL; GREEN HOME & YARD; SMITH, JOSHUA; HKT CAL INC

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Hepworth, Jessica; Hepworth, Nick. Refers to: HKT CAL INC

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Green Home

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Hepworth, Jessica; Hepworth, Nick. Refers to: GREEN HOME & YARD

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Kahn

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Hepworth, Jessica; Hepworth, Nick. Refers to: KAHN, KARL

Answer (First Papers)

Answer filed by SMITH, JOSHUA; HKT CAL INC.

Cross-Complaint (First Papers)

Cross-Complaint filed by SMITH, JOSHUA; HKT CAL INC. Refers to: KAHN, KARL; GREEN HOME & YARD; Terra Nova Realty; Moreno, Adolfo

Original Summons (Warrants/Issuance Returns)

Original Summons filed by SMITH, JOSHUA; HKT CAL INC.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-64; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by SMITH, JOSHUA; HKT CAL INC.; Filed By: SMITH, JOSHUA (Cross - Complainant); HKT CAL INC (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCross-Complaint filed by SMITH, JOSHUA; HKT CAL INC. Refers to: KAHN, KARL; GREEN HOME & YARD; Terra Nova Realty; Moreno, Adolfo; Filed By: SMITH, JOSHUA (Cross - Complainant); HKT CAL INC (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by SMITH, JOSHUA; HKT CAL INC.; Filed By: SMITH, JOSHUA (Defendant); HKT CAL INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Hepworth, Jessica; Hepworth, Nick. Refers to: GREEN HOME & YARD; Filed By: Hepworth, Jessica (Plaintiff); Hepworth, Nick (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Hepworth, Jessica; Hepworth, Nick. Refers to: KAHN, KARL; Filed By: Hepworth, Jessica (Plaintiff); Hepworth, Nick (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Hepworth, Jessica; Hepworth, Nick. Refers to: HKT CAL INC; Filed By: Hepworth, Jessica (Plaintiff); Hepworth, Nick (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/03/2022 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-64 John S. Meyer.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Meyer, John.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Hepworth, Nick; Hepworth, Jessica.; Filed By: Hepworth, Nick (Plaintiff); Hepworth, Jessica (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Hepworth, Nick; Hepworth, Jessica.; Filed By: Hepworth, Nick (Plaintiff); Hepworth, Jessica (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Hepworth, Nick; Hepworth, Jessica. Refers to: KAHN, KARL; GREEN HOME & YARD; SMITH, JOSHUA; HKT CAL INC; Filed By: Hepworth, Nick (Plaintiff); Hepworth, Jessica (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Keller Williams Realty, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRICK, JON S