This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/06/2019 at 16:53:16 (UTC).

Hensel Phelps Construction Co vs. Tower Glass Inc

Case Summary

On 05/16/2014 Hensel Phelps Construction Co filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against Tower Glass Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RONALD L. STYN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

RONALD L. STYN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Hensel Phelps Construction Co

Tower Glass Inc

Plaintiffs and Defendants

Hensel Phelps Construction Co

Insurance Company of the West

American Contractors Indemnity Company

Milgard

Milgard Inc

Milgard Manufacturing Incorporated

Milgard Tempering Incorporated

TRAVELERS CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY

FIDELITY & DEPOSIT COMPANY OF MARYLAND INC

MILGARD MANUFACTURING INC; ESA : MILGARD MANUFACTURING INCORPORATED;ESA : MILGARD TEMPERING INCORPORATED;ESA : MILGARD;ESA : MILGARD INC

Plaintiffs, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Tower Glass Inc

MILGARD MANUFACTURING INC; ESA : MILGARD MANUFACTURING INCORPORATED;ESA : MILGARD TEMPERING INCORPORATED;ESA : MILGARD INC;ESA : MILGARD

Milgard

Milgard Inc

Milgard Tempering Incorporated

Regal Industries Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Potocki, Joseph P

Attorney at BALESTRERI POTOCKI & HOLMES

401 B Street 1470

San Diego, CA 92101

Blum, Louis J

Attorney at FINCH THORNTON & BAIRD LLP

4747 Executive Drive 700

San Diego, CA 92121-3107

FURCOLO, REGAN

Attorney at WALSH MCKEAN FURCOLO LLP

550 W C Street 950

San Diego, CA 92101

BONESTEEL, SCOTT M

Attorney at KRING & CHUNG LLP

11622 El Camino Real # 100

San Diego, CA 92130

YEE, LILY S

535 Anton Blvd #1150

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

MORROW, WILLIAM D

535 Anton Blvd #1150

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

SCHOLZ, DANIEL P

4747 Executive Drive Suite 700

San Diego, CA 92121

BALDINO, RYAN WALTER

Attorney at HAMMONS & BALDINO LLP

2601 Airport Drive 105

Torrance, CA 90505

LIEBER, MEGAN K

Attorney at COLLINS COLLINS MUIR STEWART LLP

1100 El Centro St

South Pasadena, CA 91030

 

Court Documents

Answer

Answer filed by Tower Glass Inc.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Tower Glass Inc.

Declaration of Daniel P Scholz

Declaration - Other (Declaration of Daniel P Scholz) filed by Tower Glass Inc.

Order - Other

Order - Other submitted by Regal Industries Inc received but not filed on 02/11/2015.

Notice of Lodgment

Notice of Lodgment filed by Tower Glass Inc.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Tower Glass Inc. Refers to: Regal Industries Inc

Notice of Ruling

Notice of Ruling filed by Tower Glass Inc.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Insurance Company of the West.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 03/27/2015 08:30:00 AM.

Demurrer

Demurrer filed by Insurance Company of the West.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Insurance Company of the West.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Tower Glass Inc.

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

E-filing transaction partially accepted.

Request for Judicial Notice

Request for Judicial Notice filed by Milgard Manufacturing Inc.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Tower Glass Inc.

Second Amended

Amended Complaint (Second) filed by Hensel Phelps Construction Co. Refers to: Insurance Company of the West; Tower Glass Inc

Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal (NOT ENTERED) filed by Hensel Phelps Construction Co.

Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail filed by Insurance Company of the West.

151 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2016
  • Amended Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Tower Glass Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • Amended Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Hensel Phelps Construction Co.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • Amended Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Travelers Casualty and Surety Company.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • Amended Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Milgard Tempering Incorporated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • Amended Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Milgard Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • Amended Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Milgard.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • Amended Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Hensel Phelps Construction Co.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • Amended Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Fidelity & Deposit Company of Maryland Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Hensel Phelps Construction Co. Filed By: Hensel Phelps Construction Co (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
227 More Docket Entries
  • 07/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Hensel Phelps Construction Co. Refers to: American Contractors Indemnity Company Filed By: Hensel Phelps Construction Co (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Related Case filed by Hensel Phelps Construction Co. Filed By: Hensel Phelps Construction Co (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Amended Complaint (First) filed by Hensel Phelps Construction Co. Refers to: Tower Glass Inc; Insurance Company of the West; American Contractors Indemnity Company Filed By: Hensel Phelps Construction Co (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2014
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/24/2014 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-62 Ronald L. Styn.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2014
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Styn, Ronald.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2014
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2014
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Hensel Phelps Construction Co. Refers to: Tower Glass Inc; Insurance Company of the West Filed By: Hensel Phelps Construction Co (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2014
  • Original Summons filed by Hensel Phelps Construction Co. Refers to: Tower Glass Inc; Insurance Company of the West Filed By: Hensel Phelps Construction Co (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2014
  • Complaint filed by Hensel Phelps Construction Co. Refers to: Tower Glass Inc; Insurance Company of the West Filed By: Hensel Phelps Construction Co (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.