Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 02/17/2021 at 10:18:22 (UTC).

Hendrix-Alexander vs Bridge Housing Corporation

Case Summary

On 02/19/2020 Hendrix-Alexander filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Bridge Housing Corporation. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard E. L. Strauss. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Richard E. L. Strauss

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hendrix-Alexander, Jacqulyn

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Thyssenkrupp Elevator Corporation

Bridge Housing Corporation; DBA : Celadon Bridge Housing

Broadway Tower Associates LP

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Bridge Housing Corporation; DBA : Celadon Bridge Housing

Broadway Tower Associates LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Diaz, Erika

Attorney at JUREWITZ LAW GROUP

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

OLSEN, CHRISTOPHER T

Florence, David M

Attorney at LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

 

Court Documents

Amendment to Complaint

Amendment to Complaint filed by Hendrix-Alexander, Jacqulyn. Refers to: Broadway Tower Associates LP

Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number

Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Hendrix-Alexander, Jacqulyn.

Notice of Change of Address

Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Broadway Tower Associates LP.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference rescheduled to 03/19/2021 at 10:00:00 AM in C-75 before Richard E. L. Strauss at Central.

THYSSENKRUPP ELEVATOR CORPORATION'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

Answer filed by Thyssenkrupp Elevator Corporation.

THYSSENKRUPP ELEVATOR CORPORATION'S CROSS-COMPLAINT

Cross-Complaint filed by Thyssenkrupp Elevator Corporation. Refers to: Bridge Housing Corporation; Broadway Tower Associates LP

Defendant Bridge Housing Corporations Answer To Plaintiffs Complaint

Answer filed by Bridge Housing Corporation.

Defendant Cross Complainant Bridge Housing Corporations Cross Complaint

Cross-Complaint filed by Bridge Housing Corporation.

Summons Cross Complaint

Original Summons filed by Bridge Housing Corporation.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Hendrix-Alexander, Jacqulyn. Refers to: Bridge Housing Corporation

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Hendrix-Alexander, Jacqulyn. Refers to: Thyssenkrupp Elevator Corporation

Complaint

Complaint filed by Hendrix-Alexander, Jacqulyn. Refers to: Bridge Housing Corporation; Thyssenkrupp Elevator Corporation

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Hendrix-Alexander, Jacqulyn. Refers to: Bridge Housing Corporation; Thyssenkrupp Elevator Corporation

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Hendrix-Alexander, Jacqulyn. Refers to: Bridge Housing Corporation; Thyssenkrupp Elevator Corporation

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-75; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Broadway Tower Associates LP. Filed By: Broadway Tower Associates LP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Hendrix-Alexander, Jacqulyn. Filed By: Hendrix-Alexander, Jacqulyn (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint filed by Hendrix-Alexander, Jacqulyn. Refers to: Broadway Tower Associates LP Filed By: Hendrix-Alexander, Jacqulyn (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Thyssenkrupp Elevator Corporation. Filed By: Thyssenkrupp Elevator Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCross-Complaint filed by Thyssenkrupp Elevator Corporation. Refers to: Bridge Housing Corporation; Broadway Tower Associates LP Filed By: Thyssenkrupp Elevator Corporation (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Bridge Housing Corporation. Filed By: Bridge Housing Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCross-Complaint filed by Bridge Housing Corporation. Filed By: Bridge Housing Corporation (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Bridge Housing Corporation. Filed By: Bridge Housing Corporation (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference rescheduled to 03/19/2021 at 10:00:00 AM in C-75 before Richard E. L. Strauss at Central.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Hendrix-Alexander, Jacqulyn. Refers to: Bridge Housing Corporation Filed By: Hendrix-Alexander, Jacqulyn (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Hendrix-Alexander, Jacqulyn. Refers to: Thyssenkrupp Elevator Corporation Filed By: Hendrix-Alexander, Jacqulyn (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Hendrix-Alexander, Jacqulyn. Refers to: Bridge Housing Corporation; Thyssenkrupp Elevator Corporation; Broadway Tower Associates LP; Broadway Tower Associates LP Filed By: Hendrix-Alexander, Jacqulyn (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Hendrix-Alexander, Jacqulyn. Refers to: Bridge Housing Corporation; Thyssenkrupp Elevator Corporation Filed By: Hendrix-Alexander, Jacqulyn (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Hendrix-Alexander, Jacqulyn. Refers to: Bridge Housing Corporation; Thyssenkrupp Elevator Corporation Filed By: Hendrix-Alexander, Jacqulyn (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Strauss, Richard.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/13/2020 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-75 Richard E. L. Strauss.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BRIDGE HOUSING CORPORATION A NONPROFIT PUBLIC BENEFIT CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where THYSSENKRUPP ELEVATOR CORPORATION, is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FLORENCE DAVID M.