This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 12/05/2021 at 06:43:43 (UTC).

Heck vs SD Remodeling Inc

Case Summary

On 06/24/2021 Heck filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SD Remodeling Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ronald F. Frazier. The case status is Other - Consolidated.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other - Consolidated

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ronald F. Frazier

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Heck, Christopher

Defendant

SD Remodeling Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Drelich, Matan

 

Court Documents

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 8]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 8]

Notice of Related Case

Notice of Related Case filed by Heck, Christopher. Refers to: SD Remodeling Inc

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Heck, Christopher. Refers to: SD Remodeling Inc

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Heck, Christopher. Refers to: SD Remodeling Inc

Complaint

Complaint filed by Heck, Christopher. Refers to: SD Remodeling Inc

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 02/18/2022 at 10:15:00 AM at Central in C-65 Ronald F. Frazier was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketCases consolidated on 07/23/2021. 37-2021-00009115-CU-PO-CTL is designated the lead case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 02/18/2022 at 10:15:00 AM at Central in C-65 Ronald F. Frazier.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Heck, Christopher. Refers to: SD Remodeling Inc Filed By: Heck, Christopher (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Heck, Christopher. Refers to: SD Remodeling Inc Filed By: Heck, Christopher (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Heck, Christopher. Refers to: SD Remodeling Inc Filed By: Heck, Christopher (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Related Case filed by Heck, Christopher. Refers to: SD Remodeling Inc Filed By: Heck, Christopher (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Frazier, Ronald.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less