This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 11/29/2021 at 10:52:05 (UTC).

HE vs METROPOLITAN TRANSIT SYSTEM

Case Summary

On 01/19/2021 HE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against METROPOLITAN TRANSIT SYSTEM. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Carolyn Caietti. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Carolyn Caietti

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Estate of Wentian Zheng

Zheng, Lillian

He, Shuxia

Zheng, Lihua

Zheng, Lihong

Defendants and Cross Defendants

San Diego Transit Corporation

County of San Diego

State of California

North County Transit District

San Diego Association of Governments

City of San Diego

San Diego Trolley Inc

BNSF Railway Company; ESA : BNSF Company

Metropolitan Transit System; ESA : Metropolitan Transit System

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

City of San Diego

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Boyer, Ethan T

Bryan, Olga Y.

Lance, James R

Ruch, Genevieve M.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Baxter, Douglas E

Murphy, Michael E

Brooks, James IH

Quinn, Stephanie

Bingham, Roger P

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorney

Bingham, Roger P

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - as to Defendant San Diego Association of Governments only

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed by Estate of Wentian Zheng; Zheng, Lihong; Zheng, Lihua; Zheng, Lillian; He, Shuxia. Refers to: San Diego Association of Governments

Answer

Answer filed by Metropolitan Transit System.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Metropolitan Transit System.

Peremptory Challenge

Peremptory Challenge filed by Metropolitan Transit System.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Metropolitan Transit System.

Stipulation - Other (Requests)

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (to Extend Time to Respond and Order Signed 4/28/21) filed by BNSF Railway Company; Estate of Wentian Zheng; He, Shuxia; Zheng, Lihong; Zheng, Lihua; Zheng, Lillian.

Request for Dismissal - as to Defendant County of San Diego only

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party (As to County of San Diego Only) filed by Estate of Wentian Zheng; Zheng, Lihong; Zheng, Lihua; Zheng, Lillian; He, Shuxia. Refers to: County of San Diego

Stipulation - Other (Requests)

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (to Extend Time to Respond and Order Signed 5/13/21) filed by BNSF Railway Company; Estate of Wentian Zheng; He, Shuxia; Zheng, Lihong; Zheng, Lihua; Zheng, Lillian.

Stipulation - Other (Requests)

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (Extending Time for Defendant to Respond to Complaint) filed by BNSF Railway Company; Estate of Wentian Zheng; He, Shuxia; Zheng, Lihong; Zheng, Lihua; Zheng, Lillian.

Notice Of Posting Jury Fees By Defendant State Of California (By And Through The California Public Utilities Commission)

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by State of California.

Stipulation - Other (Requests)

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (Extending Time for Defendant to Respond to Complaint) filed by BNSF Railway Company; Estate of Wentian Zheng; He, Shuxia; Zheng, Lihong; Zheng, Lihua; Zheng, Lillian.

Motion to Strike (Motions)

Motion to Strike filed by BNSF Railway Company.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (Declarations/Affidavits/Statements)

Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by BNSF Railway Company.

Declaration - Other (Declarations/Affidavits/Statements)

Declaration - Other (OF KIMBERLEIGH A. FERRANDO) filed by BNSF Railway Company.

Proposed Order (Motions)

Proposed Order submitted by BNSF Railway Company received but not filed on 06/15/2021.

Ex Parte Application for Informal Discovery Conference re Amtrak Subpoena

Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents filed by He, Shuxia.

Declaration of Mr. Boyer ISO Ex Parte Application for Informal Discovery Conference re Amtrak Subpoena

Declaration - Other filed by He, Shuxia.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by He, Shuxia.

69 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2023
  • HearingLocation: C-70; Event Type: Civil Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • HearingLocation: C-70; Event Type: Trial Readiness Conference (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-70; Event Type: Summary Judgment / Summary Adjudication (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-70; Event Type: Discovery Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketSummary Judgment / Summary Adjudication (Civil) scheduled for 05/13/2022 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-70 Carolyn Caietti.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by BNSF Railway Company. Filed By: BNSF Railway Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Metropolitan Transit System. Filed By: Metropolitan Transit System (Cross - Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Metropolitan Transit System. Filed By: Metropolitan Transit System (Cross - Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Ruling filed by BNSF Railway Company. Filed By: BNSF Railway Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 10/15/2021 10:30:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
81 More Docket Entries
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Estate of Wentian Zheng; Zheng, Lihong; Zheng, Lihua; Zheng, Lillian; He, Shuxia. Refers to: City of San Diego Filed By: Estate of Wentian Zheng (Plaintiff); Zheng, Lihong (Plaintiff); Zheng, Lihua (Plaintiff); Zheng, Lillian (Plaintiff); He, Shuxia (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Estate of Wentian Zheng; Zheng, Lihong; Zheng, Lihua; Zheng, Lillian; He, Shuxia. Refers to: State of California Filed By: Estate of Wentian Zheng (Plaintiff); Zheng, Lihong (Plaintiff); Zheng, Lihua (Plaintiff); Zheng, Lillian (Plaintiff); He, Shuxia (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint filed by Estate of Wentian Zheng; Zheng, Lihong; Zheng, Lihua; Zheng, Lillian; He, Shuxia. Refers to: BNSF Railway Company Filed By: Estate of Wentian Zheng (Plaintiff); Zheng, Lihong (Plaintiff); Zheng, Lihua (Plaintiff); Zheng, Lillian (Plaintiff); He, Shuxia (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/25/2021 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by He, Shuxia; Estate of Wentian Zheng; Zheng, Lillian; Zheng, Lihong; Zheng, Lihua. Refers to: Metropolitan Transit System; San Diego Trolley Inc; San Diego Transit Corporation; North County Transit District; BNSF Railway Company; San Diego Association of Governments; City of San Diego; County of San Diego; State of California Filed By: He, Shuxia (Plaintiff); Estate of Wentian Zheng (Plaintiff); Zheng, Lillian (Plaintiff); Zheng, Lihong (Plaintiff); Zheng, Lihua (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by He, Shuxia; Estate of Wentian Zheng; Zheng, Lillian; Zheng, Lihong; Zheng, Lihua. Refers to: Metropolitan Transit System; San Diego Trolley Inc; San Diego Transit Corporation; North County Transit District; BNSF Railway Company; San Diego Association of Governments; City of San Diego; County of San Diego; State of California Filed By: He, Shuxia (Plaintiff); Estate of Wentian Zheng (Plaintiff); Zheng, Lillian (Plaintiff); Zheng, Lihong (Plaintiff); Zheng, Lihua (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by He, Shuxia; Estate of Wentian Zheng; Zheng, Lillian; Zheng, Lihong; Zheng, Lihua. Refers to: Metropolitan Transit System; San Diego Trolley Inc; San Diego Transit Corporation; North County Transit District; BNSF Railway Company; San Diego Association of Governments; City of San Diego; County of San Diego; State of California Filed By: He, Shuxia (Plaintiff); Estate of Wentian Zheng (Plaintiff); Zheng, Lillian (Plaintiff); Zheng, Lihong (Plaintiff); Zheng, Lihua (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Wohlfeil, Joel.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less