Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 18:50:07 (UTC).

HD Supply Construction Supply LTD vs Reinforcing Ready Inc

Case Summary

On 07/06/2016 HD Supply Construction Supply LTD filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Reinforcing Ready Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOAN M. LEWIS. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

JOAN M. LEWIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HD SUPPLY CONSTRUCTION SUPPLY LTD; DBA : HD SUPPLY CONSTRUCTION & INDUSTRIAL/ WHITE CAP

Defendant

REINFORCING READY INC; DBA : JD REINFORCING

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHAELEN, SCOTT A

Attorney at WALTERS TOWNSEND & SCHAELEN APLC

411 Camino Del Rio South 202

San Diego, CA 92108

Defendant Attorney

PLUMBREE, A MARIA

 

Court Documents

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by HD Supply Construction Supply LTD. Refers to: Reinforcing Ready Inc

Answer

Answer filed by Reinforcing Ready Inc.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Reinforcing Ready Inc.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 01/27/2017 10:15:00 AM.

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (Stipulation for Settlement Payments and Entry of Judgment Upon Default; Order Thereon) filed by HD Supply Construction Supply LTD. Refers to: Reinforcing Ready Inc

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) heard 07/28/2017 10:00:00 AM.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Complaint

Complaint filed by HD Supply Construction Supply LTD. Refers to: Reinforcing Ready Inc

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by HD Supply Construction Supply LTD. Refers to: Reinforcing Ready Inc

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by HD Supply Construction Supply LTD. Refers to: Reinforcing Ready Inc

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2017
  • Civil Jury Trial scheduled for 08/18/2017 at 09:45:00 AM at Central in C-65 Joan M. Lewis was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed scheduled for 09/01/2017 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-65 Joan M. Lewis was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) heard 07/28/2017 10:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed scheduled for 09/01/2017 at 10:00AM before Judge Joan M. Lewis.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to HD Supply Construction Supply LTD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Reinforcing Ready Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (Stipulation for Settlement Payments and Entry of Judgment Upon Default; Order Thereon) filed by HD Supply Construction Supply LTD. Refers to: Reinforcing Ready Inc Filed By: HD Supply Construction Supply LTD (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 01/27/2017 10:15:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • This matter is referred to Mediation per stipulation of the parties.

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 01/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed by Reinforcing Ready Inc. Filed By: Reinforcing Ready Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer filed by Reinforcing Ready Inc. Filed By: Reinforcing Ready Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by HD Supply Construction Supply LTD. Refers to: Reinforcing Ready Inc Filed By: HD Supply Construction Supply LTD (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2016
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/27/2017 at 10:15:00 AM at Central in C-65 Joan M. Lewis.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2016
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Lewis, Joan.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2016
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by HD Supply Construction Supply LTD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by HD Supply Construction Supply LTD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by HD Supply Construction Supply LTD.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HD SUPPLY CONSTRUCTION SUPPLY GROUP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where JD REINFORCING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant