This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 11/27/2021 at 02:31:06 (UTC).

HCA Pepperwood Apartments LP vs Boisclair

Case Summary

On 09/10/2020 HCA Pepperwood Apartments LP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Boisclair. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HCA Pepperwood Apartments LP

Defendants

Boisclair, Guy R

Boisclair, Melissa D; AKA : Boisclair, Melisa D

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Khalidy, Kareem M

Attorney at KIMBALL TIREY & ST JOHN LLP

7676 Hazard Center Drive Suite 900

San Diego, CA 92108

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Mandatory Cover Sheet and Supplemental Allegations-Unlawful Detainer

Plaintiff's Mandatory Cover Sheet and Supplemental Allegations-Unlawful Detainer (with Proof of Service) filed by HCA Pepperwood Apartments LP. Refers to: Boisclair, Guy; Boisclair, Melissa

Notice to Filing Party SD

Judgment by Default by Court (Received on 3/4/21) submitted by HCA Pepperwood Apartments LP rejected on 03/11/2021.

Request for Dismissal of Does

Request for Dismissal of Does (Without Prejudice - Does I-X) filed by HCA Pepperwood Apartments LP.

Declarations in Support of Default Judgment by Court CCP 585(d)

Declarations in Support of Default Judgment by Court CCP 585(d) (Amended - and Other Supporting Documents) filed by HCA Pepperwood Apartments LP.

Application for Entry of Judgment

Application for Entry of Judgment filed by HCA Pepperwood Apartments LP. Refers to: Boisclair, Guy; Boisclair, Melissa

Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

Memorandum of Costs (Summary) filed by HCA Pepperwood Apartments LP.

Judgment by Default by Court

Judgment by Default by Court filed by HCA Pepperwood Apartments LP. Refers to: Boisclair, Guy; Boisclair, Melissa

Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney filed by HCA Pepperwood Apartments LP.

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by HCA Pepperwood Apartments LP. Refers to: Boisclair, Melissa; Boisclair, Guy

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by HCA Pepperwood Apartments LP. Refers to: Boisclair, Melissa; Boisclair, Guy

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by HCA Pepperwood Apartments LP. Refers to: Boisclair, Melissa; Boisclair, Guy

Unlawful Detainer Supplemental Cover Sheet

Unlawful Detainer Supplemental Cover Sheet filed by HCA Pepperwood Apartments LP.

Notice that you have been sued SD

Case initiation form printed.

Plaintiff's Mandatory Cover Sheet and Supplemental Allegations-Unlawful Detainer

Plaintiff's Mandatory Cover Sheet and Supplemental Allegations-Unlawful Detainer filed by HCA Pepperwood Apartments LP.

Proof of Service of 5-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 5-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by HCA Pepperwood Apartments LP. Refers to: Boisclair, Melissa

Proof of Service of 5-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 5-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by HCA Pepperwood Apartments LP. Refers to: Boisclair, Guy

Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants

Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants filed by HCA Pepperwood Apartments LP.

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default (and Unknowns) filed by HCA Pepperwood Apartments LP. Refers to: Boisclair, Guy; Boisclair, Melissa

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney filed by HCA Pepperwood Apartments LP. Filed By: HCA Pepperwood Apartments LP (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court filed by HCA Pepperwood Apartments LP. Refers to: Boisclair, Guy; Boisclair, Melissa Filed By: HCA Pepperwood Apartments LP (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketJudgment entered for HCA Pepperwood Apartments LP and against Boisclair, Guy R ;Boisclair, Melissa D for a grand total of $ 5611.57 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclarations in Support of Default Judgment by Court CCP 585(d) (Amended - and Other Supporting Documents) filed by HCA Pepperwood Apartments LP. Filed By: HCA Pepperwood Apartments LP (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication for Entry of Judgment filed by HCA Pepperwood Apartments LP. Refers to: Boisclair, Guy; Boisclair, Melissa Filed By: HCA Pepperwood Apartments LP (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs (Summary) filed by HCA Pepperwood Apartments LP. Filed By: HCA Pepperwood Apartments LP (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court (Received on 3/4/21) submitted by HCA Pepperwood Apartments LP rejected on 03/11/2021. Filed By: HCA Pepperwood Apartments LP (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPlaintiff's Mandatory Cover Sheet and Supplemental Allegations-Unlawful Detainer (with Proof of Service) filed by HCA Pepperwood Apartments LP. Refers to: Boisclair, Guy; Boisclair, Melissa Filed By: HCA Pepperwood Apartments LP (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal of Does (Without Prejudice - Does I-X) filed by HCA Pepperwood Apartments LP. Filed By: HCA Pepperwood Apartments LP (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession Returned - Wholly Satisfied filed by HCA Pepperwood Apartments LP. Filed By: HCA Pepperwood Apartments LP (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default (and Unknowns) filed by HCA Pepperwood Apartments LP. Refers to: Boisclair, Guy; Boisclair, Melissa Filed By: HCA Pepperwood Apartments LP (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketDefault entered as to Boisclair, Melissa D on Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by HCA Pepperwood Apartments LP .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketDefault entered as to Boisclair, Guy R on Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by HCA Pepperwood Apartments LP .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by HCA Pepperwood Apartments LP. Refers to: Boisclair, Melissa; Boisclair, Guy Filed By: HCA Pepperwood Apartments LP (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by HCA Pepperwood Apartments LP. Refers to: Boisclair, Melissa; Boisclair, Guy Filed By: HCA Pepperwood Apartments LP (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by HCA Pepperwood Apartments LP. Refers to: Boisclair, Melissa; Boisclair, Guy Filed By: HCA Pepperwood Apartments LP (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Supplemental Cover Sheet filed by HCA Pepperwood Apartments LP. Filed By: HCA Pepperwood Apartments LP (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department C-60.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less