This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 06/30/2022 at 08:11:31 (UTC).

Haulcy vs City of San Diego

Case Summary

On 04/01/2022 Haulcy filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against City of San Diego. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory W Pollack. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Gregory W Pollack

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Haulcy, Michelle

Defendant

CITY OF SAN DIEGO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joseph, James

Attorney at JUREWITZ LAW GROUP

600 B Street 1450

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant Attorney

Pearson, John P

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE CITY ATTORNEY

1200 Third Avenue 1100

San Diego, CA 92101-4100

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint filed by Haulcy, Michelle. Refers to: CITY OF SAN DIEGO

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Haulcy, Michelle. Refers to: CITY OF SAN DIEGO

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Haulcy, Michelle. Refers to: CITY OF SAN DIEGO

Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address

Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address filed by Haulcy, Michelle. Refers to: CITY OF SAN DIEGO

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 8]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 8]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address (Participant Information)

Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address filed by CITY OF SAN DIEGO.

Proof of Service (Proof of Service - General)

Proof of Service filed by CITY OF SAN DIEGO.

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by Haulcy, Michelle. Refers to: CITY OF SAN DIEGO

Answer (First Papers)

Answer filed by CITY OF SAN DIEGO.

Proof of Service (Proof of Service - General)

Proof of Service filed by CITY OF SAN DIEGO.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-71; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by CITY OF SAN DIEGO.; Filed By: CITY OF SAN DIEGO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by CITY OF SAN DIEGO.; Filed By: CITY OF SAN DIEGO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by Haulcy, Michelle. Refers to: CITY OF SAN DIEGO; Filed By: Haulcy, Michelle (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by CITY OF SAN DIEGO.; Filed By: CITY OF SAN DIEGO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketConsent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address filed by CITY OF SAN DIEGO.; Filed By: CITY OF SAN DIEGO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 09/02/2022 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-71 Gregory W Pollack.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Pollack, Gregory.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketConsent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address filed by Haulcy, Michelle. Refers to: CITY OF SAN DIEGO; Filed By: Haulcy, Michelle (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Haulcy, Michelle. Refers to: CITY OF SAN DIEGO; Filed By: Haulcy, Michelle (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Haulcy, Michelle. Refers to: CITY OF SAN DIEGO; Filed By: Haulcy, Michelle (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Haulcy, Michelle. Refers to: CITY OF SAN DIEGO; Filed By: Haulcy, Michelle (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph, James