This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 06/20/2021 at 08:20:00 (UTC).

Hartley vs Medical Staff of Olympia Medical Center

Case Summary

On 03/22/2021 Hartley filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Medical Staff of Olympia Medical Center. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory W Pollack. The case status is Other - Transferred.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Gregory W Pollack

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hartley, Darron

Defendants

La Brea Rehabilitation Center LLC

Medical Staff of Olympia Medical Center; DBA : Olympia Medical Center

Cedars-Sinai Medical Center

Guardian Ad Litem

Hollins, Tulainer

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gruenberg, Joshua D

Attorney at GRUENBERG LAW

Defendant Attorney

Moulin, Lee M

Attorney at LEIBL MIRETSKY & MOSELY LLP

 

Court Documents

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Hartley, Darron. Refers to: Medical Staff of Olympia Medical Center; La Brea Rehabilitation Center LLC; Cedars-Sinai Medical Center

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Hartley, Darron. Refers to: Medical Staff of Olympia Medical Center; La Brea Rehabilitation Center LLC; Cedars-Sinai Medical Center

Complaint

Complaint filed by Hartley, Darron. Refers to: Medical Staff of Olympia Medical Center; La Brea Rehabilitation Center LLC; Cedars-Sinai Medical Center

Notice of posting fees

Notice - Other (of Posting Fees) filed by Hartley, Darron.

Proof of Service re LA BREA REHABILITATION CENTER, LLC

Proof of Service filed by Hartley, Darron.

Notice of Signing of an Order RE Change of Venue and Request for Payment of Fees SD

Notice of Signing of an Order RE Change of Venue and Request for Payment of Fees SD generated.

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (Re Transfer of Venue and Order) filed by Cedars-Sinai Medical Center; Hartley, Darron.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Proof of Service filed by Hartley, Darron.

Declaration of Due Diligence

Declaration of Due Diligence filed by Hartley, Darron. Refers to: Medical Staff of Olympia Medical Center; La Brea Rehabilitation Center LLC; Cedars-Sinai Medical Center

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Proof of Service filed by Hartley, Darron.

Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint

Amended Complaint (FIRST) filed by Hartley, Darron. Refers to: Medical Staff of Olympia Medical Center; La Brea Rehabilitation Center LLC; Cedars-Sinai Medical Center

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

Application and Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem (ORDER SIGNED ON 04/20/2021) filed by Hollins, Tulainer. Refers to: Hartley, Darron

Notice of Case Transmittal and Notice of Receipt of Transferred Case SD

Case file contents transferred to receiving court LOS ANGELES pursuant to court order.

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase file contents transferred to receiving court LOS ANGELES pursuant to court order.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Hartley, Darron. Filed By: Hartley, Darron (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice - Other (of Posting Fees) filed by Hartley, Darron. Filed By: Hartley, Darron (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Signing of an Order RE Change of Venue and Request for Payment of Fees SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/27/2021 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-71 Gregory W Pollack was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Hartley, Darron. Filed By: Hartley, Darron (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Due Diligence filed by Hartley, Darron. Refers to: Medical Staff of Olympia Medical Center; La Brea Rehabilitation Center LLC; Cedars-Sinai Medical Center Filed By: Hartley, Darron (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Hartley, Darron. Filed By: Hartley, Darron (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Complaint (FIRST) filed by Hartley, Darron. Refers to: Medical Staff of Olympia Medical Center; La Brea Rehabilitation Center LLC; Cedars-Sinai Medical Center Filed By: Hartley, Darron (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation - Other - Fee Due (Re Transfer of Venue and Order) filed by Cedars-Sinai Medical Center; Hartley, Darron. Filed By: Cedars-Sinai Medical Center (Defendant); Hartley, Darron (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication and Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem (ORDER SIGNED ON 04/20/2021) filed by Hollins, Tulainer. Refers to: Hartley, Darron Filed By: Hollins, Tulainer (Guardian Ad Litem)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/27/2021 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-71 Gregory W Pollack.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Hartley, Darron. Refers to: Medical Staff of Olympia Medical Center; La Brea Rehabilitation Center LLC; Cedars-Sinai Medical Center Filed By: Hartley, Darron (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Hartley, Darron. Refers to: Medical Staff of Olympia Medical Center; La Brea Rehabilitation Center LLC; Cedars-Sinai Medical Center Filed By: Hartley, Darron (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Hartley, Darron. Refers to: Medical Staff of Olympia Medical Center; La Brea Rehabilitation Center LLC; Cedars-Sinai Medical Center Filed By: Hartley, Darron (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Pollack, Gregory.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LA BREA REHABILITAION CENTER LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where OLYMPIA MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MOULIN LEE MICHAEL