This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/17/2018 at 21:02:07 (UTC).

Hartford Casualty Insurance Company vs Southweset Pipeline and Trenchless Corp

Case Summary

On 09/20/2017 Hartford Casualty Insurance Company filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Southweset Pipeline and Trenchless Corp. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GREGORY W POLLACK. The case status is Other - Consolidated.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other - Consolidated

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

GREGORY W POLLACK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HARTFORD CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

SOUTHWESET PIPELINE AND TRENCHLESS CORP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JENSEN, RICK

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint filed by Hartford Casualty Insurance Company. Refers to: Southweset Pipeline and Trenchless Corp

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Hartford Casualty Insurance Company. Refers to: Southweset Pipeline and Trenchless Corp

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Hartford Casualty Insurance Company. Refers to: Southweset Pipeline and Trenchless Corp

Notice of Related Case

Notice of Related Case filed by Hartford Casualty Insurance Company. Refers to: Southweset Pipeline and Trenchless Corp

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2017
  • Cases consolidated on 11/02/2017. 37-2016-00009410-CU-PO-CTL is designated the lead case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 02/23/2018 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-71 Gregory W Pollack was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 02/23/2018 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-71 Gregory W Pollack.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Pollack, Gregory.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • Summons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Related Case filed by Hartford Casualty Insurance Company. Refers to: Southweset Pipeline and Trenchless Corp Filed By: Hartford Casualty Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Hartford Casualty Insurance Company. Refers to: Southweset Pipeline and Trenchless Corp Filed By: Hartford Casualty Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Hartford Casualty Insurance Company. Refers to: Southweset Pipeline and Trenchless Corp Filed By: Hartford Casualty Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by Hartford Casualty Insurance Company. Refers to: Southweset Pipeline and Trenchless Corp Filed By: Hartford Casualty Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less