This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 07/04/2022 at 08:05:03 (UTC).

HARRISON VS CHILDREN OF THE IMMACULATE HEART

Case Summary

On 04/05/2022 HARRISON filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against CHILDREN OF THE IMMACULATE HEART. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Eddie C Sturgeon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Eddie C Sturgeon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HARRISON, AMANEECE

Defendant

Children of the Immaculate Heart

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lyon, Geoffrey C

Attorney at LYON LAW PC

3605 Long Beach Blvd Ste 311

Long Beach, CA 90807

Defendant Attorneys

Jonna, Paul M

LiMandri, Charles S

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint filed by HARRISON, AMANEECE. Refers to: Children of the Immaculate Heart

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by HARRISON, AMANEECE. Refers to: Children of the Immaculate Heart

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by HARRISON, AMANEECE. Refers to: Children of the Immaculate Heart

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by HARRISON, AMANEECE. Refers to: Children of the Immaculate Heart

Declaration of Demurring or Moving Party in Support of Automatic Extension

Declaration of Meet and Confer filed by Children of the Immaculate Heart.

Amended Complaint

Amended Complaint (First Amended) filed by HARRISON, AMANEECE. Refers to: Children of the Immaculate Heart

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2023
  • HearingLocation: C-67; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Complaint (First Amended) filed by HARRISON, AMANEECE. Refers to: Children of the Immaculate Heart; Filed By: HARRISON, AMANEECE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Meet and Confer filed by Children of the Immaculate Heart.; Filed By: Children of the Immaculate Heart (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by HARRISON, AMANEECE. Refers to: Children of the Immaculate Heart; Filed By: HARRISON, AMANEECE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/10/2023 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-67 Eddie C Sturgeon.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Sturgeon, Eddie.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by HARRISON, AMANEECE. Refers to: Children of the Immaculate Heart; Filed By: HARRISON, AMANEECE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by HARRISON, AMANEECE. Refers to: Children of the Immaculate Heart; Filed By: HARRISON, AMANEECE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by HARRISON, AMANEECE. Refers to: Children of the Immaculate Heart; Filed By: HARRISON, AMANEECE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LYON GEOFFREY C. ESQ.