This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 08/17/2020 at 03:37:16 (UTC).

Harpole vs HERNANDEZ

Case Summary

On 05/26/2020 Harpole filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against HERNANDEZ. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Jacqueline M. Stern. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************A-NC

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    North County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Jacqueline M. Stern

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Harpole, Lisa

Defendants

Hernandez, Jorge

Colunga Trucking Inc

Intervenor

PLAZA INDEMNITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Walton, Randall R

Defendant and Intervenor Attorney

Cutforth, Kerri

Attorney at FIELDSLAW

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANT JORGE HERNANDEZS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

Answer filed by Hernandez, Jorge.

STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER RE PLAZA INDEMNITY COMPANYS APPLICATION TO INTERVENE

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due filed by Hernandez, Jorge; Harpole, Lisa; PLAZA INDEMNITY COMPANY.

PROOF OF SERVICE

Proof of Service filed by Hernandez, Jorge.

Answer

Answer filed by PLAZA INDEMNITY COMPANY.

Complaint

Complaint filed by Harpole, Lisa. Refers to: Hernandez, Jorge; Colunga Trucking Inc

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Harpole, Lisa. Refers to: Hernandez, Jorge; Colunga Trucking Inc

Summons

Original Summons filed by Harpole, Lisa. Refers to: Hernandez, Jorge; Colunga Trucking Inc

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2021
  • HearingLocation: N-27; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation - Other - Fee Due filed by Hernandez, Jorge; Harpole, Lisa; PLAZA INDEMNITY COMPANY. Filed By: Hernandez, Jorge (Defendant); Harpole, Lisa (Plaintiff); PLAZA INDEMNITY COMPANY (Intervenor)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Hernandez, Jorge. Filed By: Hernandez, Jorge (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by PLAZA INDEMNITY COMPANY. Filed By: PLAZA INDEMNITY COMPANY (Intervenor)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Hernandez, Jorge. Filed By: Hernandez, Jorge (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/12/2021 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-27 Jacqueline M. Stern.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Harpole, Lisa. Refers to: Hernandez, Jorge; Colunga Trucking Inc; PLAZA INDEMNITY COMPANY Filed By: Harpole, Lisa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Harpole, Lisa. Refers to: Hernandez, Jorge; Colunga Trucking Inc Filed By: Harpole, Lisa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Harpole, Lisa. Refers to: Hernandez, Jorge; Colunga Trucking Inc Filed By: Harpole, Lisa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Stern, Jacqueline.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Plaza Indemnity Insurance Co is a litigant