This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 02/03/2022 at 04:00:53 (UTC).

Hardy vs UHaul Company of California Inc

Case Summary

On 01/06/2022 Hardy filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against UHaul Company of California Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Pending - Trial.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Trial

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hardy, Amelia

San Diego, CA 92105

Defendants

UHaul Company of California Inc; DBA : UHaul Company of San Diego

Vala, Erick

 

Court Documents

Order on Court Fee Waiver

Order on Court Fee Waiver filed by Hardy, Amelia.

Order on Court Fee Waiver

Order on Court Fee Waiver filed by Hardy, Amelia.

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Notice of Case Assignment Small Claims SD

Case initiation form printed.

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Hardy, Amelia; Hardy, Amelia. Refers to: UHaul Company of California Inc; Vala, Erick

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

Request - Other

Request - Other (Request for Service by Certified Mail) filed by Hardy, Amelia. Refers to: UHaul Company of California Inc

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-63; Event Type: Small Claims Court Trial - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketCertified Mail Green Card Tracking Numbers filed by The Superior Court of San Diego. Refers to: UHaul Company of California Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest - Other (Request for Service by Certified Mail) filed by Hardy, Amelia. Refers to: UHaul Company of California Inc Filed By: Hardy, Amelia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial scheduled for 04/11/2022 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-63 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver filed by Hardy, Amelia. Filed By: Hardy, Amelia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver filed by Hardy, Amelia. Filed By: Hardy, Amelia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Hardy, Amelia; Hardy, Amelia. Refers to: UHaul Company of California Inc; Vala, Erick Filed By: Hardy, Amelia (Plaintiff); Hardy, Amelia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Department C-63.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees filed by Hardy, Amelia. Filed By: Hardy, Amelia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees filed by Hardy, Amelia. Filed By: Hardy, Amelia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UHAUL is a litigant