This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/24/2018 at 01:27:53 (UTC).

Hanna vs. The State of California Department of Mortor Vehicles

Case Summary

On 04/13/2012 Hanna filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against The State of California Department of Mortor Vehicles. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, East County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is EDDIE C STURGEON. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************M-EC

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    East County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

EDDIE C STURGEON

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Hanna, Charles

Respondent

The State of California Department of Mortor Vehicles

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Neuharth, Paul H Jr

1140 Union St #102

San Diego, CA 92101

Respondent Attorney

HAGAN, MARTIN W

110 Plaza, 110 W A St

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

Petition for Writ of Mandate

Petition for Writ of Mandate filed by Hanna, Charles. Refers to: The State of California Department of Mortor Vehicles

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Hanna, Charles. Refers to: The State of California Department of Mortor Vehicles

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents

Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents (REQEUST FOR STAY OF ORDER SUSPENDING PETITIONER'S DRIVER'S LICENSE; Decl. of Paul Neuharth, Jr.; Decl. of Counsel; Memo of P's & A's) filed by Hanna, Charles.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 04/19/2012 08:30:00 AM.

Order - Other

Order - Other (GRANTED TO PLACE STAY ON SUSPENSION OF PETITIONER'S DRIVER'S LICENSE) filed by Hanna, Charles. Refers to: The State of California Department of Mortor Vehicles

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt (REQUEST FOR STAY OF ORDER) filed by Hanna, Charles. Refers to: The State of California Department of Mortor Vehicles

Response

Response (RESPONDENT'S RETURN TO PETITIN FOR WRIT OF ADMINSTRATIVE MANDATE) filed by The State of California Department of Mortor Vehicles.

Petition for Hearing

Petition for Hearing (and Supporting Documents) filed by Hanna, Charles.

Stipulation - Other

Stipulation - Other (Stipulation to Continue Hearing Date on Petition for Writ of Mandate and Order Thereon) filed by Hanna, Charles. Refers to: The State of California Department of Mortor Vehicles

Notice of Conditional Settlement

Notice of Conditional Settlement filed by Hanna, Charles.

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Hanna, Charles.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Hanna, Charles. Filed By: Hanna, Charles (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2012
  • Hearing on Petition scheduled for 10/19/2012 at 09:00:00 AM at East County in E-14 Eddie C Sturgeon was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Conditional Settlement filed by Hanna, Charles. Filed By: Hanna, Charles (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2012
  • Hearing on Petition scheduled for 10/19/2012 at 09:00:00 AM at East County in E-14 Eddie C Sturgeon.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2012
  • The Hearing on Petition was rescheduled to 10/19/2012 at 09:00:00 AM in E-14 before Eddie C Sturgeon at East County.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation - Other (Stipulation to Continue Hearing Date on Petition for Writ of Mandate and Order Thereon) filed by Hanna, Charles. Refers to: The State of California Department of Mortor Vehicles Filed By: Hanna, Charles (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Hearing (and Supporting Documents) filed by Hanna, Charles. Filed By: Hanna, Charles (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Response (RESPONDENT'S RETURN TO PETITIN FOR WRIT OF ADMINSTRATIVE MANDATE) filed by The State of California Department of Mortor Vehicles. Filed By: The State of California Department of Mortor Vehicles (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt (REQUEST FOR STAY OF ORDER) filed by Hanna, Charles. Refers to: The State of California Department of Mortor Vehicles Filed By: Hanna, Charles (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Order - Other (GRANTED TO PLACE STAY ON SUSPENSION OF PETITIONER'S DRIVER'S LICENSE) filed by Hanna, Charles. Refers to: The State of California Department of Mortor Vehicles Filed By: Hanna, Charles (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 04/19/2012 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2012
  • Hearing on Petition scheduled for 09/07/2012 at 09:00AM before Judge Eddie C Sturgeon.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2012
  • The ex parte application for stay order suspending petitioner's driver's license was granted without prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents (REQEUST FOR STAY OF ORDER SUSPENDING PETITIONER'S DRIVER'S LICENSE; Decl. of Paul Neuharth, Jr.; Decl. of Counsel; Memo of P's & A's) filed by Hanna, Charles. Filed By: Hanna, Charles (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2012
  • Ex Parte scheduled for 04/19/2012 at 08:30:00 AM at East County in E-14 Eddie C Sturgeon.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2012
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Sturgeon, Eddie.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Hanna, Charles. Refers to: The State of California Department of Mortor Vehicles Filed By: Hanna, Charles (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Writ of Mandate filed by Hanna, Charles. Refers to: The State of California Department of Mortor Vehicles Filed By: Hanna, Charles (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less