This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/10/2019 at 07:12:35 (UTC).

Hanna Lawand vs. Fadi Al Attar

Case Summary

On 10/14/2010 Hanna Lawand filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Fadi Al Attar. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego East County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************C-EC

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LAWAND, HANNA

Defendant

ATTAR, FADI AL

 

Court Documents

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) SD

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) SD generated.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Motion to Vacate Judgment heard 04/15/2011 08:00:00 AM.

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) SD

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) SD generated.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Small Claims Court Trial heard 02/18/2011 08:00:00 AM.

Minute Order

Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

Minute Order

Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

Notice to Filing Party SD

Proof of Service of Claim and Order to Defendant - Personal submitted by Lawand, Hanna rejected on 11/17/2010. Refers to: Attar, Fadi

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) SD generated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Motion to Vacate Judgment heard 04/15/2011 08:00:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2011
  • DocketThe Court finds judgment on the Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court for Hanna Lawand and against Fadi Al Attar in the amount of: $920.00 principal, $80.00 costs, $0 pre-judgment interest. Judgment resulted from an accident.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2011
  • DocketThe Motion to Vacate was granted .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2011
  • DocketJudgment entered against Hanna Lawand, Fadi Al Attar on the Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2011
  • DocketMotion to Vacate Judgment scheduled for 04/15/2011 at 08:00:00 AM at East County in E-20 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2011
  • DocketMotion to Vacate filed by Attar, Fadi Al. Refers to: Lawand, Hanna Filed By: Attar, Fadi Al (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) SD generated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 01/06/2011
  • DocketThe Small Claims Court Trial was rescheduled to 02/18/2011 at 08:00:00 AM in E-20 before at East County.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMiscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2010
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial scheduled for 01/06/2011 at 08:00:00 AM at East County in E-20 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2010
  • DocketThe Small Claims Court Trial was rescheduled to 01/06/2011 at 08:00:00 AM in E-20 before at East County.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Claim and Order to Defendant - Personal submitted by Lawand, Hanna rejected on 11/17/2010. Refers to: Attar, Fadi Filed By: Lawand, Hanna (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2010
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial scheduled for 11/18/2010 at 08:00:00 AM at East County in E-20 was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2010
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial scheduled for 11/18/2010 at 08:00:00 AM at East County in E-20 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2010
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial scheduled for 11/18/2010 at 08:00:00 AM at East County in E-20 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2010
  • DocketCase assigned to Department E-20.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2010
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Lawand, Hanna. Refers to: Attar, Fadi Filed By: Lawand, Hanna (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less