This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 12/03/2021 at 08:11:32 (UTC).

Han vs Liu

Case Summary

On 04/01/2021 Han filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Liu. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ronald F. Frazier. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ronald F. Frazier

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Han, Jessica

Defendant

Liu, Shuyi

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Figueroa, Jessica

Defendant Attorney

Sweet, Wallace H

Attorney at STRATMAN SCHWARTZ & WILLIAMS ABREGO

 

Court Documents

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Han, Jessica. Refers to: Liu, Shuyi

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Han, Jessica. Refers to: Liu, Shuyi

Complaint

Complaint filed by Han, Jessica. Refers to: Liu, Shuyi

Demand for Jury and Notice of Posting Jury Fees

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Liu, Shuyi.

Answer to Complaint

Answer filed by Liu, Shuyi.

Request for Dismissal (Judgment/Dismissal)

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Han, Jessica.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/19/2021 at 11:00:00 AM at Central in C-65 Ronald F. Frazier was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Han, Jessica. Filed By: Han, Jessica (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Liu, Shuyi .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Han, Jessica .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Liu, Shuyi. Filed By: Liu, Shuyi (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Liu, Shuyi. Filed By: Liu, Shuyi (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Han, Jessica. Refers to: Liu, Shuyi Filed By: Han, Jessica (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Han, Jessica. Refers to: Liu, Shuyi Filed By: Han, Jessica (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Han, Jessica. Refers to: Liu, Shuyi Filed By: Han, Jessica (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Frazier, Ronald.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/19/2021 at 11:00:00 AM at Central in C-65 Ronald F. Frazier.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Figueroa, Jessica