This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 12/05/2021 at 02:59:03 (UTC).

Hampton vs HSS Inc

Case Summary

On 06/07/2021 Hampton filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against HSS Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kenneth J Medel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kenneth J Medel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hampton, Peron

Defendant

HSS Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Martin, Rick

Attorney at ANGEL CITY LAW PC

645 W 9Th St Unit 110

Los Angeles, CA 90015

Defendant Attorneys

Sonne, Matthew M

Lewis, Bryanne J.

Attorney at SHEPPARD MULLIN RICHTER AND HAMPTON LLP

333 S Hope Street 43Rd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Hampton, Peron. Refers to: HSS Inc

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Hampton, Peron. Refers to: HSS Inc

Complaint

Complaint filed by Hampton, Peron. Refers to: HSS Inc

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Hampton, Peron. Refers to: HSS Inc

Joint Stipulation and [PROPOSED] Order Extending Time for Defendant to File Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (Joint Stipulation and Order Extending Time for Defendant to File Responsive Pleading to Complaint) filed by HSS Inc; Hampton, Peron.

Stipulation - Other

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (Extending Time for Defendant to Respond to Complaint, Order signed 8/27/21) filed by HSS Inc; Hampton, Peron.

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (Requests)

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (Order Extending Time for Defendant to File Respsonsive Pleading to Plaintiffs Complaint) filed by HSS Inc; Hampton, Peron.

Joint Stipulation and Order Extending Time for Defendant to File Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (Extending Time for Defendant to Respond to Complaint, Order signed 9/28/21) filed by HSS Inc; Hampton, Peron.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-66; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation - Other - Fee Due (Order Extending Time for Defendant to File Respsonsive Pleading to Plaintiffs Complaint) filed by HSS Inc; Hampton, Peron. Filed By: HSS Inc (Defendant); Hampton, Peron (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation - Other - Fee Due (Extending Time for Defendant to Respond to Complaint, Order signed 9/28/21) filed by HSS Inc; Hampton, Peron. Filed By: HSS Inc (Defendant); Hampton, Peron (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation - Other - Fee Due (Extending Time for Defendant to Respond to Complaint, Order signed 8/27/21) filed by HSS Inc; Hampton, Peron. Filed By: HSS Inc (Defendant); Hampton, Peron (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation - Other - Fee Due (Joint Stipulation and Order Extending Time for Defendant to File Responsive Pleading to Complaint) filed by HSS Inc; Hampton, Peron. Filed By: HSS Inc (Defendant); Hampton, Peron (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Hampton, Peron. Refers to: HSS Inc Filed By: Hampton, Peron (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Hampton, Peron. Refers to: HSS Inc Filed By: Hampton, Peron (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Hampton, Peron. Refers to: HSS Inc Filed By: Hampton, Peron (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Hampton, Peron. Refers to: HSS Inc Filed By: Hampton, Peron (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Medel, Kenneth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 02/04/2022 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-66 Kenneth J Medel.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HSS INC. A COLORADO CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Martin, Rick