This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 08/13/2019 at 13:10:32 (UTC).

Hammer Down Inc vs The Whiting-Turner Contracting Company

Case Summary

On 04/20/2018 Hammer Down Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against The Whiting-Turner Contracting Company. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JACQUELINE M. STERN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************C-NC

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

JACQUELINE M. STERN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HAMMER DOWN INC

Defendants

ROUSE PROPERTIES INC

THE WHITING-TURNER CONTRACTING COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HARVEY, ROBERT CHRISTOPHER

501 West Broadway Suite 800

San Diego, CA 92101

MILTNER, WILLIAM L

15088 Cross Stone Dr

San Diego, CA 92127

 

Court Documents

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by HAMMER DOWN INC. Refers to: The Whiting-Turner Contracting Company; Rouse Properties Inc

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by HAMMER DOWN INC. Refers to: The Whiting-Turner Contracting Company; Rouse Properties Inc

Complaint

Complaint filed by HAMMER DOWN INC. Refers to: The Whiting-Turner Contracting Company; Rouse Properties Inc

Notice of Recorded Pendency of Action

Notice of Recorded Pendency of Action filed by HAMMER DOWN INC.

Notice - Other

Notice - Other (Notice of Withdrawal of Lis Pendens) filed by HAMMER DOWN INC.

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by HAMMER DOWN INC. Refers to: The Whiting-Turner Contracting Company; Rouse Properties Inc

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by HAMMER DOWN INC. Refers to: The Whiting-Turner Contracting Company; Rouse Properties Inc

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by HAMMER DOWN INC. Refers to: The Whiting-Turner Contracting Company; Rouse Properties Inc Filed By: HAMMER DOWN INC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/04/2019 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-27 Jacqueline M. Stern was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • DocketComplaint dismissed without prejudice as to HAMMER DOWN INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • DocketComplaint dismissed without prejudice as to Rouse Properties Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • DocketComplaint dismissed without prejudice as to The Whiting-Turner Contracting Company.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by HAMMER DOWN INC. Refers to: The Whiting-Turner Contracting Company; Rouse Properties Inc Filed By: HAMMER DOWN INC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice - Other (Notice of Withdrawal of Lis Pendens) filed by HAMMER DOWN INC. Filed By: HAMMER DOWN INC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Recorded Pendency of Action filed by HAMMER DOWN INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/04/2019 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-27 Jacqueline M. Stern.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Stern, Jacqueline.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by HAMMER DOWN INC. Refers to: The Whiting-Turner Contracting Company; Rouse Properties Inc Filed By: HAMMER DOWN INC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by HAMMER DOWN INC. Refers to: The Whiting-Turner Contracting Company; Rouse Properties Inc Filed By: HAMMER DOWN INC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by HAMMER DOWN INC. Refers to: The Whiting-Turner Contracting Company; Rouse Properties Inc Filed By: HAMMER DOWN INC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less