This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/16/2018 at 14:54:03 (UTC).

Hamilton Meat LLC vs The Jet Group LLC

Case Summary

On 04/04/2017 Hamilton Meat LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against The Jet Group LLC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HAMILTON MEAT LLC; DBA : HAMILTON MEATS AND PROVISIONS

Defendant

THE JET GROUP LLC; DBA : BESO HOLLYWOOD;DBA : VIVA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CARLIN, IRA S

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Collections SD

Case initiation form printed.

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Hamilton Meat LLC. Refers to: The Jet Group LLC

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Hamilton Meat LLC. Refers to: The Jet Group LLC

Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000

Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by Hamilton Meat LLC. Refers to: The Jet Group LLC

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Hamilton Meat LLC.

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from C-27 to 903 effective 01/13/2018.

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from C-07 to C-27 effective 09/23/2017.

 

Docket Entries

01/30/2018

DocketComplaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 dismissed without prejudice as to Hamilton Meat LLC.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/30/2018

DocketComplaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 dismissed without prejudice as to The Jet Group LLC.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/30/2018
View Court Documents

DocketRequest for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Hamilton Meat LLC. Filed By: Hamilton Meat LLC (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2018
View Court Documents

DocketCase reassigned from C-27 to 903 effective 01/13/2018.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/23/2017
View Court Documents

DocketCase reassigned from C-07 to C-27 effective 09/23/2017.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/04/2017
View Court Documents

DocketCase initiation form printed.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/04/2017

DocketCase assigned to Department C-07.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/04/2017

DocketSummons issued.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/04/2017
View Court Documents

DocketOriginal Summons filed by Hamilton Meat LLC. Refers to: The Jet Group LLC Filed By: Hamilton Meat LLC (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/04/2017
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Hamilton Meat LLC. Refers to: The Jet Group LLC Filed By: Hamilton Meat LLC (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/04/2017
View Court Documents

DocketComplaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by Hamilton Meat LLC. Refers to: The Jet Group LLC Filed By: Hamilton Meat LLC (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less