This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/29/2023 at 08:07:10 (UTC).

Halbert vs. Wampler

Case Summary

On 12/29/2022 Halbert filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Wampler. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Earl H. Maas, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************L-NC

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Earl H. Maas, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Halbert, Kenneth

Halbert, Shannon

Kenneth Halbert, as Successor in Interest to Decedent Paige Halbert

Shannon Halbert, as Successor in Interest to Decedent Paige Halbert

Defendants

Cessna Aircraft Company

City of Oceanside

GOJUMP America, LLC

GOJUMP Oceanside

GOJUMP Oceanside, LLC

Honeywell Inc

Honeywell International, Inc

KDG Aviation, LLC

Texas Turbine Conversions, Inc

Textron Inc

Wampler, Matthew Glen

B & B Aviation, LLC; DBA : Skydive Spaceland;ESA : Skydive Spaceland

7 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Embrey, Patrick Brian

Defendant Attorneys

Kelleher, Thomas R

Willner, Arthur I

TERHAR, MICHAEL J

HEMBREE, JONATHAN E

Other Attorneys

SALDANA, MANUEL

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by GOJUMP America, LLC; GOJUMP Oceanside; GOJUMP Oceanside, LLC.

Answer to Plaintiffs' Unverified Complaint and Jury Trial Demand

Answer filed by GOJUMP America, LLC; GOJUMP Oceanside; GOJUMP Oceanside, LLC.

Stipulation Regarding Dismissal Without Prejudice of Textron Inc.

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due filed by Textron Aviation Inc., for itself and as a successor by merger to Cessna Aircraft Company; Halbert, Kenneth; Halbert, Shannon.

Proposed Order on Motion of Specially Appearing Defendant Texas Turbine Conversions, Inc. to Quash Service of Summons for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction

Proposed Order (5/26/2023) submitted by Texas Turbine Conversions, Inc received but not filed on 03/02/2023.

Notice of Motion and Motion of Specially Appearing Defendant Texas Turbine Conversions, inc. to Quash Service of Summons and Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction; Declaration of Bobby Bishop

Motion to Quash Service of Summons (5/26/2023) filed by Texas Turbine Conversions, Inc.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Desert Sand Aircraft Leasing Company, Inc; Wampler, Matthew Glen; Boyd, Stephen.

Answer of Textron Aviation Inc., For Itself And As A Successor By Merger To Cessna Aircraft Company

Answer filed by Textron Aviation Inc., for itself and as a successor by merger to Cessna Aircraft Company.

Proof of Service (Proof of Service - General)

Proof of Service filed by Kenneth Halbert, as Successor in Interest to Decedent Paige Halbert; Shannon Halbert, as Successor in Interest to Decedent Paige Halbert. Refers to: GOJUMP America, LLC

Proof of Service (Proof of Service - General)

Proof of Service filed by Kenneth Halbert, as Successor in Interest to Decedent Paige Halbert; Shannon Halbert, as Successor in Interest to Decedent Paige Halbert. Refers to: GOJUMP Oceanside

Proof of Service (Proof of Service - General)

Proof of Service filed by Kenneth Halbert, as Successor in Interest to Decedent Paige Halbert; Shannon Halbert, as Successor in Interest to Decedent Paige Halbert. Refers to: GOJUMP Oceanside, LLC

Proof of Service (Proof of Service - General)

Proof of Service filed by Kenneth Halbert, as Successor in Interest to Decedent Paige Halbert; Shannon Halbert, as Successor in Interest to Decedent Paige Halbert. Refers to: Honeywell International, Inc

Proof of Service (Proof of Service - General)

Proof of Service filed by Kenneth Halbert, as Successor in Interest to Decedent Paige Halbert; Shannon Halbert, as Successor in Interest to Decedent Paige Halbert. Refers to: KDG Aviation, LLC

Proof of Service (Proof of Service - General)

Proof of Service filed by Kenneth Halbert, as Successor in Interest to Decedent Paige Halbert; Shannon Halbert, as Successor in Interest to Decedent Paige Halbert. Refers to: Wampler, Matthew

Proof of Service (Proof of Service - General)

Proof of Service filed by Kenneth Halbert, as Successor in Interest to Decedent Paige Halbert; Shannon Halbert, as Successor in Interest to Decedent Paige Halbert. Refers to: Texas Turbine Conversions, Inc

Proof of Service (Proof of Service - General)

Proof of Service filed by Kenneth Halbert, as Successor in Interest to Decedent Paige Halbert; Shannon Halbert, as Successor in Interest to Decedent Paige Halbert. Refers to: Textron Aviation Inc., for itself and as a successor by merger to Cessna Aircraft Company

Proof of Service (Proof of Service - General)

Proof of Service filed by Kenneth Halbert, as Successor in Interest to Decedent Paige Halbert; Shannon Halbert, as Successor in Interest to Decedent Paige Halbert.

Proof of Service (Proof of Service - General)

Proof of Service filed by Kenneth Halbert, as Successor in Interest to Decedent Paige Halbert; Shannon Halbert, as Successor in Interest to Decedent Paige Halbert. Refers to: Desert Sand Aircraft Leasing Company, Inc

Answer

Answer filed by Wampler, Matthew Glen; Desert Sand Aircraft Leasing Company, Inc; Boyd, Stephen.

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

06/02/2023

HearingLocation: N-28; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2023

HearingLocation: N-28; Event Type: Motion to Quash (Civil)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2023

HearingLocation: N-28; Event Type: Motion to Quash (Civil) - Motion to Quash Service of Summons

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketProof of Service filed by GOJUMP America, LLC; GOJUMP Oceanside; GOJUMP Oceanside, LLC.; Filed By: GOJUMP America, LLC (Defendant); GOJUMP Oceanside (Defendant); GOJUMP Oceanside, LLC (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAnswer filed by GOJUMP America, LLC; GOJUMP Oceanside; GOJUMP Oceanside, LLC.; Filed By: GOJUMP America, LLC (Defendant); GOJUMP Oceanside (Defendant); GOJUMP Oceanside, LLC (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/08/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStipulation - Other - Fee Due filed by Textron Aviation Inc., for itself and as a successor by merger to Cessna Aircraft Company; Halbert, Kenneth; Halbert, Shannon.; Filed By: Textron Aviation Inc., for itself and as a successor by merger to Cessna Aircraft Company (Defendant); Halbert, Kenneth (Plaintiff); Halbert, Shannon (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/08/2023

DocketComplaint dismissed without prejudice as to Textron Inc.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketProposed Order (5/26/2023) submitted by Texas Turbine Conversions, Inc received but not filed on 03/02/2023.; Filed By: Texas Turbine Conversions, Inc (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMotion to Quash Service of Summons (5/26/2023) filed by Texas Turbine Conversions, Inc.; Filed By: Texas Turbine Conversions, Inc (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/01/2023

DocketMotion to Quash (Civil) scheduled for 05/26/2023 at 01:30:00 PM at North County in N-28 Earl H. Maas.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
17 More Docket Entries
01/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketProof of Service filed by Kenneth Halbert, as Successor in Interest to Decedent Paige Halbert; Shannon Halbert, as Successor in Interest to Decedent Paige Halbert. Refers to: Textron Aviation Inc., for itself and as a successor by merger to Cessna Aircraft Company; Filed By: Kenneth Halbert, as Successor in Interest to Decedent Paige Halbert (Plaintiff); Shannon Halbert, as Successor in Interest to Decedent Paige Halbert (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketProof of Service filed by Kenneth Halbert, as Successor in Interest to Decedent Paige Halbert; Shannon Halbert, as Successor in Interest to Decedent Paige Halbert.; Filed By: Kenneth Halbert, as Successor in Interest to Decedent Paige Halbert (Plaintiff); Shannon Halbert, as Successor in Interest to Decedent Paige Halbert (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketProof of Service filed by Kenneth Halbert, as Successor in Interest to Decedent Paige Halbert; Shannon Halbert, as Successor in Interest to Decedent Paige Halbert. Refers to: Desert Sand Aircraft Leasing Company, Inc; Filed By: Kenneth Halbert, as Successor in Interest to Decedent Paige Halbert (Plaintiff); Shannon Halbert, as Successor in Interest to Decedent Paige Halbert (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/30/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCase initiation form printed.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/30/2022

DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/02/2023 at 10:00:00 AM at North County in N-28 Earl H. Maas.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/30/2022

DocketSummons issued.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/29/2022

DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Maas, Earl.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/29/2022
View Court Documents

DocketOriginal Summons filed by Kenneth Halbert, as Successor in Interest to Decedent Paige Halbert; Shannon Halbert, as Successor in Interest to Decedent Paige Halbert. Refers to: Cessna Aircraft Company; Textron Aviation Inc., for itself and as a successor by merger to Cessna Aircraft Company; Textron Inc; Texas Turbine Conversions, Inc; Honeywell Inc; Honeywell International, Inc; Desert Sand Aircraft Leasing Company, Inc; B & B Aviation, LLC; GOJUMP America, LLC; GOJUMP Oceanside; GOJUMP Oceanside, LLC; City of Oceanside; KDG Aviation, LLC; Wampler, Matthew; Boyd, Stephen; Filed By: Kenneth Halbert, as Successor in Interest to Decedent Paige Halbert (Plaintiff); Shannon Halbert, as Successor in Interest to Decedent Paige Halbert (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/29/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Kenneth Halbert, as Successor in Interest to Decedent Paige Halbert; Shannon Halbert, as Successor in Interest to Decedent Paige Halbert. Refers to: Cessna Aircraft Company; Textron Aviation Inc., for itself and as a successor by merger to Cessna Aircraft Company; Textron Inc; Texas Turbine Conversions, Inc; Honeywell Inc; Honeywell International, Inc; Desert Sand Aircraft Leasing Company, Inc; B & B Aviation, LLC; GOJUMP America, LLC; GOJUMP Oceanside; GOJUMP Oceanside, LLC; City of Oceanside; KDG Aviation, LLC; Wampler, Matthew; Boyd, Stephen; Filed By: Kenneth Halbert, as Successor in Interest to Decedent Paige Halbert (Plaintiff); Shannon Halbert, as Successor in Interest to Decedent Paige Halbert (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/29/2022
View Court Documents

DocketComplaint filed by Kenneth Halbert, as Successor in Interest to Decedent Paige Halbert; Shannon Halbert, as Successor in Interest to Decedent Paige Halbert; Halbert, Kenneth; Halbert, Shannon. Refers to: Cessna Aircraft Company; Textron Aviation Inc., for itself and as a successor by merger to Cessna Aircraft Company; Textron Inc; Texas Turbine Conversions, Inc; Honeywell Inc; Honeywell International, Inc; Desert Sand Aircraft Leasing Company, Inc; B & B Aviation, LLC; GOJUMP America, LLC; GOJUMP Oceanside; GOJUMP Oceanside, LLC; City of Oceanside; KDG Aviation, LLC; Wampler, Matthew; Boyd, Stephen; Filed By: Kenneth Halbert, as Successor in Interest to Decedent Paige Halbert (Plaintiff); Shannon Halbert, as Successor in Interest to Decedent Paige Halbert (Plaintiff); Halbert, Kenneth (Plaintiff); Halbert, Shannon (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less