This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 04:30:07 (UTC).

HAAS vs KB HOME COASTAL INC

Case Summary

On 04/05/2016 HAAS filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against KB HOME COASTAL INC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RONALD L. STYN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

RONALD L. STYN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

VANBUEGE, DOUGLAS

MUNOZ, ART

LIENEWEG, CARRIE

MUNOZ, PAMELA

LIENEWEG, PATRICK

CUNNINGHAM, ROBERT

DAVIS, ERIC

NEPOMUCENO, MELODIE

ROSSI, MARCIEL

CUNNINGHAM, MARYBETH

VANBUEGE, TERRE

LOWRIE, LANCE

SIMON, JOSHUA

WEBSTER-LOWRIE, SUZANNE

HAAS, CATHERINE

ROSSI, MICHAEL

SIMON, MELISSA

WOOD, ALAINA D

POUMELE, JESSICA

Defendant

KB HOME COASTAL INC

2 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WANKE, BLAINE

Attorney at MILSTEIN JACKSON FAIRCHILD AND WADE LLP

2800 Donald Douglas Loop N

Santa Monica, CA 90405

ADELMAN, FRED M

Attorney at MILSTEIN JACKSON FAIRCHILD & WADE LLP

2800 Donald Douglas Loop N

Santa Monica, CA 90405

Defendant Attorneys

SCHNEIDER, DANIEL S

Attorney at NEWMEYER & DUILLION LLP

895 Dove Street 5Th Floor

Newport Beach, CA 92660

PROTZMANN, RICHARD W.

895 Dove Street 5Th Floor

Newport Beach, CA 92660

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by WOOD, ALAINA D; WOOD, ALAINA D; Munoz, Art; Munoz, Art; LIENEWEG, CARRIE; LIENEWEG, CARRIE; HAAS, CATHERINE; HAAS, CATHERINE; VANBUEGE, DOUGLAS; VANBUEGE, DOUGLAS;OTHERS.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 01/05/2018 10:30:00 AM.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by WOOD, ALAINA D; WOOD, ALAINA D; Munoz, Art; Munoz, Art; LIENEWEG, CARRIE; LIENEWEG, CARRIE; HAAS, CATHERINE; HAAS, CATHERINE; VANBUEGE, DOUGLAS; VANBUEGE, DOUGLAS;OTHERS.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by WOOD, ALAINA D; WOOD, ALAINA D; Munoz, Art; Munoz, Art; LIENEWEG, CARRIE; LIENEWEG, CARRIE; HAAS, CATHERINE; HAAS, CATHERINE; VANBUEGE, DOUGLAS; VANBUEGE, DOUGLAS;OTHERS.

Notice of Ruling

Notice of Ruling filed by KB Home Coastal Inc.

Proof of Service of 30 day Summons Complaint Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by The Superior Court of null. Refers to: WOOD, ALAINA; Munoz, Art; LIENEWEG, CARRIE; HAAS, CATHERINE; VANBUEGE, DOUGLAS; Davis, Eric; WOOD, GREGORY; SIMON, JOSHUA; LOWRIE, LANCE; ROSSI, MARCIEL; Cunningham, Marybeth; Simon, Melissa; NEPOMUCENO, MELODIE; Rossi, Michael; MUNOZ, PAMELA; LIENEWEG, PATRICK; Cunningham, Robert; WEBSTER-LOWRIE, SUZANNE; VANBUEGE, TERRE; Munoz, Art; Cunningham, Robert; Simon, Melissa; Davis, Eric; Rossi, Michael; Cunningham, Marybeth; HAAS, CATHERINE; LIENEWEG, PATRICK; LIENEWEG, CARRIE; MUNOZ, PAMELA; ROSSI, MARCIEL; VANBUEGE, DOUGLAS; VANBUEGE, TERRE; LOWRIE, LANCE; WEBSTER-LOWRIE, SUZANNE; WOOD, GREGORY; WOOD, ALAINA; SIMON, JOSHUA; NEPOMUCENO, MELODIE

Clerks Certificate of Electronic Service

Clerks Certificate of Electronic Service (Stipulation and Order Staying the Entire Action Pending Plaintiffs Compliance with Civil Code 895 et set ROA# 21) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Civil Case Management Conference was rescheduled to 01/05/2018 at 10:30:00 AM in C-62 before Ronald L. Styn at Central.

Status Statement Regarding the Right to Repair Process Submitted by Defendant KB Home Coastal Inc

Statement - Other (Status Statement Regarding the Right to Repair Process Submitted by Defendant KB Home Coastal Inc) filed by KB Home Coastal Inc.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 07/28/2017 10:30:00 AM.

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by HAAS, CATHERINE; Cunningham, Robert; Cunningham, Marybeth; LIENEWEG, PATRICK; LIENEWEG, CARRIE; Munoz, Art; MUNOZ, PAMELA; Rossi, Michael; ROSSI, MARCIEL; SIMON, JOSHUA;OTHERS. Refers to: KB Home Coastal Inc

Summons on First Amended Complaint

Original Summons filed by Munoz, Art; LIENEWEG, CARRIE; HAAS, CATHERINE; VANBUEGE, DOUGLAS; Davis, Eric; SIMON, JOSHUA; LOWRIE, LANCE; ROSSI, MARCIEL; Cunningham, Marybeth; Simon, Melissa;OTHERS.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.

Notice - Other

Notice - Other (Notice of Entry of Order) filed by KB Home Coastal Inc.

Stipulation - Other

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (AND ORDER SIGNED 10/19/16 STAYING THE ENTIRE ACTION) filed by Munoz, Art; LIENEWEG, CARRIE; HAAS, CATHERINE; VANBUEGE, DOUGLAS; Davis, Eric; SIMON, JOSHUA; LOWRIE, LANCE; ROSSI, MARCIEL; Cunningham, Marybeth; Simon, Melissa;OTHERS. Refers to: KB Home Coastal Inc

KB Home's Case Management Statement - Haas

Case Management Statement filed by KB Home Coastal Inc.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by WOOD, ALAINA D; WOOD, ALAINA D; Munoz, Art; Munoz, Art; LIENEWEG, CARRIE; LIENEWEG, CARRIE; HAAS, CATHERINE; HAAS, CATHERINE; VANBUEGE, DOUGLAS; VANBUEGE, DOUGLAS;OTHERS.

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 03/29/2018 10:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • Civil Case Management Conference continued pursuant to Court's motion to 07/06/2018 at 10:30AM before Judge Ronald L. Styn.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed by WOOD, ALAINA D; WOOD, ALAINA D; Munoz, Art; Munoz, Art; LIENEWEG, CARRIE; LIENEWEG, CARRIE; HAAS, CATHERINE; HAAS, CATHERINE; VANBUEGE, DOUGLAS; VANBUEGE, DOUGLAS;OTHERS. Filed By: WOOD, ALAINA D (Plaintiff); WOOD, ALAINA D (Plaintiff); Munoz, Art (Plaintiff); Munoz, Art (Plaintiff); LIENEWEG, CARRIE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (Stipulation and Order to Add One Home to This Action) filed by HAAS, CATHERINE; HAAS, CATHERINE; KB Home Coastal Inc. Filed By: HAAS, CATHERINE (Plaintiff); HAAS, CATHERINE (Plaintiff); KB Home Coastal Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 01/05/2018 10:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • Civil Case Management Conference continued pursuant to Court's motion to 03/29/2018 at 10:30AM before Judge Ronald L. Styn.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed by WOOD, ALAINA D; WOOD, ALAINA D; Munoz, Art; Munoz, Art; LIENEWEG, CARRIE; LIENEWEG, CARRIE; HAAS, CATHERINE; HAAS, CATHERINE; VANBUEGE, DOUGLAS; VANBUEGE, DOUGLAS;OTHERS. Filed By: WOOD, ALAINA D (Plaintiff); WOOD, ALAINA D (Plaintiff); Munoz, Art (Plaintiff); Munoz, Art (Plaintiff); LIENEWEG, CARRIE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/05/2018 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-62 Ronald L. Styn.

    Read MoreRead Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 06/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Amended Complaint (1ST) filed by Munoz, Art; LIENEWEG, CARRIE; HAAS, CATHERINE; VANBUEGE, DOUGLAS; Davis, Eric; SIMON, JOSHUA; LOWRIE, LANCE; ROSSI, MARCIEL; Cunningham, Marybeth; Simon, Melissa;OTHERS. Refers to: KB Home Coastal Inc Filed By: Munoz, Art (Plaintiff); LIENEWEG, CARRIE (Plaintiff); HAAS, CATHERINE (Plaintiff); VANBUEGE, DOUGLAS (Plaintiff); Davis, Eric (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Munoz, Art; LIENEWEG, CARRIE; HAAS, CATHERINE; VANBUEGE, DOUGLAS; Davis, Eric; SIMON, JOSHUA; LOWRIE, LANCE; ROSSI, MARCIEL; Cunningham, Marybeth; Simon, Melissa;OTHERS. Filed By: Munoz, Art (Plaintiff); LIENEWEG, CARRIE (Plaintiff); HAAS, CATHERINE (Plaintiff); VANBUEGE, DOUGLAS (Plaintiff); Davis, Eric (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Munoz, Art; LIENEWEG, CARRIE; HAAS, CATHERINE; VANBUEGE, DOUGLAS; Davis, Eric; SIMON, JOSHUA; LOWRIE, LANCE; ROSSI, MARCIEL; Cunningham, Marybeth; Simon, Melissa;OTHERS. Filed By: Munoz, Art (Plaintiff); LIENEWEG, CARRIE (Plaintiff); HAAS, CATHERINE (Plaintiff); VANBUEGE, DOUGLAS (Plaintiff); Davis, Eric (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 09/16/2016 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-62 Ronald L. Styn.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Styn, Ronald.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by HAAS, CATHERINE; Cunningham, Robert; Cunningham, Marybeth; LIENEWEG, PATRICK; LIENEWEG, CARRIE; Munoz, Art; MUNOZ, PAMELA; Rossi, Michael; ROSSI, MARCIEL; SIMON, JOSHUA;OTHERS. Refers to: KB Home Coastal Inc Filed By: HAAS, CATHERINE (Plaintiff); Cunningham, Robert (Plaintiff); Cunningham, Marybeth (Plaintiff); LIENEWEG, PATRICK (Plaintiff); LIENEWEG, CARRIE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by HAAS, CATHERINE; Cunningham, Robert; Cunningham, Marybeth; LIENEWEG, PATRICK; LIENEWEG, CARRIE; Munoz, Art; MUNOZ, PAMELA; Rossi, Michael; ROSSI, MARCIEL; SIMON, JOSHUA;OTHERS. Refers to: KB Home Coastal Inc Filed By: HAAS, CATHERINE (Plaintiff); Cunningham, Robert (Plaintiff); Cunningham, Marybeth (Plaintiff); LIENEWEG, PATRICK (Plaintiff); LIENEWEG, CARRIE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by HAAS, CATHERINE; Cunningham, Robert; Cunningham, Marybeth; LIENEWEG, PATRICK; LIENEWEG, CARRIE; Munoz, Art; MUNOZ, PAMELA; Rossi, Michael; ROSSI, MARCIEL; SIMON, JOSHUA;OTHERS. Refers to: KB Home Coastal Inc Filed By: HAAS, CATHERINE (Plaintiff); Cunningham, Robert (Plaintiff); Cunningham, Marybeth (Plaintiff); LIENEWEG, PATRICK (Plaintiff); LIENEWEG, CARRIE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.