This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 11/29/2021 at 08:43:57 (UTC).

Guzman VS Ceja

Case Summary

On 01/08/2021 Guzman filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Ceja. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Timothy Taylor. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Timothy Taylor

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Guzman, Gabriel

Defendants, Others and Cross Plaintiffs

Wetzel, Bryson Michael

Ceja, Roberto Romero

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

Ceja, Roberto Romero

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BAYONA, EBER N

Attorney at SWEET JAMES LLP

4220 Von Karman Ave Suite 200

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Defendant, Other and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Kandarian-Stein, Gina Y

Attorney at GATES GONTER GUY PROUDFOOT & MUENCH LLP

38 Discovery #200

Irvine, CA 92618

Coderre, Matthew

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF THOMAS D POKLADOWSKI & ASSOCI

1450 Frazee Road 405

San Diego, CA 92108

Reeves, Sheryl Lee

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF THOMAS D POKLADOWSKI & ASSOCIA

1450 Frazee Road 405

San Diego, CA 92108

Ebright, Jeffrey

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Coderre, Matthew

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF THOMAS D POKLADOWSKI & ASSOCI

1450 Frazee Road 405

San Diego, CA 92108

Reeves, Sheryl Lee

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF THOMAS D POKLADOWSKI & ASSOCIA

1450 Frazee Road 405

San Diego, CA 92108

 

Court Documents

Notice of Change in Handling Attorney (Participant Information)

Notice of Change in Handling Attorney filed by Ceja, Roberto Romero.

Answer (First Papers)

Answer filed by Wetzel, Bryson Michael.

Cross-Complaint (First Papers)

Cross-Complaint filed by Wetzel, Bryson Michael. Refers to: Ceja, Roberto

Request - Other (Requests)

Request - Other (for statement of damages) filed by Wetzel, Bryson Michael.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit (Notices)

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Wetzel, Bryson Michael.

Original Summons (Warrants/Issuance Returns)

Original Summons filed by Wetzel, Bryson Michael. Refers to: Ceja, Roberto

Demand for Jury Trial (Trial/Hearing Setting)

Demand for Jury Trial filed by Wetzel, Bryson Michael.

Case Management Statement (Case Management)

Case Management Statement filed by Ceja, Roberto Romero.

Case Management Statement (Case Management)

Case Management Statement filed by Guzman, Gabriel.

Answer (First Papers)

Answer filed by Ceja, Roberto Romero.

Cross-Complaint (First Papers)

Cross-Complaint filed by Ceja, Roberto Romero. Refers to: Wetzel, Bryson

Case Management Statement (Case Management)

Case Management Statement filed by Wetzel, Bryson Michael.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 07/30/2021 09:30:00 AM.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party (Judgment/Dismissal)

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party (NOT ENTERED) filed by Guzman, Gabriel.

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party (Judgment/Dismissal)

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party (as to Roberto Romero Ceja ONLY) filed by Guzman, Gabriel. Refers to: Ceja, Roberto

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party (Judgment/Dismissal)

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party (as to Bryson Michael Wetzel ONLY) filed by Ceja, Roberto Romero. Refers to: Wetzel, Bryson

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-72; Event Type: Civil Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-72; Event Type: Trial Readiness Conference (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action (NOT ENTERED) filed by Wetzel, Bryson Michael. Filed By: Wetzel, Bryson Michael (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party (as to Roberto Romero Ceja ONLY) filed by Guzman, Gabriel. Refers to: Ceja, Roberto Filed By: Guzman, Gabriel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Ceja, Roberto Romero .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party (as to Bryson Michael Wetzel ONLY) filed by Ceja, Roberto Romero. Refers to: Wetzel, Bryson Filed By: Ceja, Roberto Romero (Cross - Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Wetzel, Bryson Michael .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party (NOT ENTERED) filed by Guzman, Gabriel. Filed By: Guzman, Gabriel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial scheduled for 08/05/2022 at 08:30AM before Judge Timothy Taylor.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketTrial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 07/22/2022 at 09:00AM before Judge Timothy Taylor.

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 8]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 8]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 8]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-filing transaction partially accepted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Guzman, Gabriel. Filed By: Guzman, Gabriel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Guzman, Gabriel. Refers to: Ceja, Roberto; Wetzel, Bryson Filed By: Guzman, Gabriel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Guzman, Gabriel. Refers to: Ceja, Roberto Filed By: Guzman, Gabriel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Guzman, Gabriel. Refers to: Ceja, Roberto Filed By: Guzman, Gabriel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Taylor, Timothy.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CODERRE, MATTHEW

Latest cases represented by Lawyer REEVES SHERYL LEE