This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 02/21/2023 at 07:06:29 (UTC).

Guild Mortgage Company LLC vs CROSSCOUNTRY MORTGAGE LLC

Case Summary

On 12/23/2022 Guild Mortgage Company LLC filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against CROSSCOUNTRY MORTGAGE LLC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Keri Katz. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Keri Katz

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Guild Mortgage Company LLC

Defendant

CROSSCOUNTRY MORTGAGE LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Schwartz, Eric B

555 W Fifth Street 4000

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Hummel, Chad S

Attorney at SIDLEY AUSTIN LLP

1999 Avenue Of The Stars 17Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Defendant Attorney

Bergstrom, Richard J

Attorney at JONES DAY

4655 Executive Drive 1500

San Diego, CA 92121-3134

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Email

Proof of Service filed by CROSSCOUNTRY MORTGAGE LLC.

Declaration in Support of Motion to Stay, plus Exhibits

Declaration - Other filed by CROSSCOUNTRY MORTGAGE LLC.

Proposed Order

E-filing transaction partially accepted.

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

[Another document for ROA# 15]

Proof of Service by Email

[Another document for ROA# 15]

Declaration of Rick Bergstrom in Support of Motion to Stay

[Another document for ROA# 15]

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Stay

[Another document for ROA# 15]

Notice of Motion and Motion to Stay

[Another document for ROA# 15]

Proof of Service by Email

Proof of Service filed by CROSSCOUNTRY MORTGAGE LLC.

Proposed Order

Proposed Order submitted by CROSSCOUNTRY MORTGAGE LLC received but not filed on 01/27/2023.

Declaration of Rick Bergstrom in Support of Motion to Stay

Declaration - Other (of Rick Bergstrom) filed by CROSSCOUNTRY MORTGAGE LLC.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Stay

Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by CROSSCOUNTRY MORTGAGE LLC.

Notice of Motion and Motion to Stay

Motion for Order to Stay Proceedings filed by CROSSCOUNTRY MORTGAGE LLC.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Proof of Service - Case Initiating Document)

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Guild Mortgage Company LLC. Refers to: CROSSCOUNTRY MORTGAGE LLC

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Original Summons (Warrants/Issuance Returns)

Original Summons filed by Guild Mortgage Company LLC. Refers to: CROSSCOUNTRY MORTGAGE LLC

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2023
  • HearingLocation: C-74; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • HearingLocation: C-74; Event Type: Motion Hearing (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by CROSSCOUNTRY MORTGAGE LLC.; Filed By: CROSSCOUNTRY MORTGAGE LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other filed by CROSSCOUNTRY MORTGAGE LLC.; Filed By: CROSSCOUNTRY MORTGAGE LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-filing transaction partially accepted.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 15]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 15]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 15]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 15]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 15]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Order to Stay Proceedings filed by CROSSCOUNTRY MORTGAGE LLC.; Filed By: CROSSCOUNTRY MORTGAGE LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketMotion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 05/05/2023 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-74 Keri Katz.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Guild Mortgage Company LLC. Refers to: CROSSCOUNTRY MORTGAGE LLC; Filed By: Guild Mortgage Company LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/16/2023 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-74 Keri Katz.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Katz, Keri.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Guild Mortgage Company LLC. Refers to: CROSSCOUNTRY MORTGAGE LLC; Filed By: Guild Mortgage Company LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Guild Mortgage Company LLC. Refers to: CROSSCOUNTRY MORTGAGE LLC; Filed By: Guild Mortgage Company LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Guild Mortgage Company LLC. Refers to: CROSSCOUNTRY MORTGAGE LLC; Filed By: Guild Mortgage Company LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less