This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/07/2023 at 08:09:48 (UTC).

Guevara vs Providence Group Inc

Case Summary

On 12/07/2022 Guevara filed an Other lawsuit against Providence Group Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Carolyn Caietti. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Carolyn Caietti

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GUEVARA, ROSA

Defendants

Del Rosa Villaidence Opco LLc

Hancock, Mark

Murray, Jason

Providence Administrative Consulting Services Inc

Providence Group Inc

Providence Group of Southern California LLC

Guardian Ad Litem

Salcido, Patricia

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Garcia, Stephen M.

Attorney at GARCIA ARTIGLIERE & MEDBY One World Trade Center

1 World Trade Center #1950

Long Beach, CA 90831

Defendant Attorney

Sitar, Laura K

2875 Michelle Dr Ste 150

Irvine, CA 92606

 

Court Documents

Answer (First Papers)

Answer filed by Del Rosa Villaidence Opco LLc.

Answer (First Papers)

Answer filed by Providence Administrative Consulting Services Inc.

Answer (First Papers)

Answer filed by Providence Group Inc.

Answer (First Papers)

Answer filed by Providence Group of Southern California LLC.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by GUEVARA, ROSA.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by GUEVARA, ROSA.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by GUEVARA, ROSA.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by GUEVARA, ROSA.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by GUEVARA, ROSA.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by GUEVARA, ROSA.

Application and Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem

Application and Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem filed by GUEVARA, ROSA. Refers to: Salcido, Patricia

Notice of Remote Appearance

Notice of Remote Appearance filed by GUEVARA, ROSA.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by GUEVARA, ROSA. Refers to: Providence Group Inc; Providence Administrative Consulting Services Inc; Providence Group of Southern California LLC; Del Rosa Villaidence Opco LLc; Murray, Jason; Hancock, Mark

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by GUEVARA, ROSA. Refers to: Providence Group Inc; Providence Administrative Consulting Services Inc; Providence Group of Southern California LLC; Del Rosa Villaidence Opco LLc; Murray, Jason; Hancock, Mark

Complaint

Complaint filed by GUEVARA, ROSA. Refers to: Providence Group Inc; Providence Administrative Consulting Services Inc; Providence Group of Southern California LLC; Del Rosa Villaidence Opco LLc; Murray, Jason; Hancock, Mark

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2023
  • HearingLocation: C-70; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Del Rosa Villaidence Opco LLc.; Filed By: Del Rosa Villaidence Opco LLc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Providence Administrative Consulting Services Inc.; Filed By: Providence Administrative Consulting Services Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Providence Group Inc.; Filed By: Providence Group Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Providence Group of Southern California LLC.; Filed By: Providence Group of Southern California LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by GUEVARA, ROSA.; Filed By: GUEVARA, ROSA (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by GUEVARA, ROSA.; Filed By: GUEVARA, ROSA (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by GUEVARA, ROSA.; Filed By: GUEVARA, ROSA (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by GUEVARA, ROSA.; Filed By: GUEVARA, ROSA (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by GUEVARA, ROSA.; Filed By: GUEVARA, ROSA (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by GUEVARA, ROSA.; Filed By: GUEVARA, ROSA (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication and Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem filed by GUEVARA, ROSA. Refers to: Salcido, Patricia; Filed By: GUEVARA, ROSA (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearance filed by GUEVARA, ROSA.; Filed By: GUEVARA, ROSA (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/12/2023 at 09:45:00 AM at Central in C-70 Carolyn Caietti.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Caietti, Carolyn.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by GUEVARA, ROSA. Refers to: Providence Group Inc; Providence Administrative Consulting Services Inc; Providence Group of Southern California LLC; Del Rosa Villaidence Opco LLc; Murray, Jason; Hancock, Mark; Filed By: GUEVARA, ROSA (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by GUEVARA, ROSA. Refers to: Providence Group Inc; Providence Administrative Consulting Services Inc; Providence Group of Southern California LLC; Del Rosa Villaidence Opco LLc; Murray, Jason; Hancock, Mark; Filed By: GUEVARA, ROSA (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by GUEVARA, ROSA. Refers to: Providence Group Inc; Providence Administrative Consulting Services Inc; Providence Group of Southern California LLC; Del Rosa Villaidence Opco LLc; Murray, Jason; Hancock, Mark; Filed By: GUEVARA, ROSA (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less