This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 11/28/2021 at 11:33:31 (UTC).

Guerrero vs DMSD Restaurants INC

Case Summary

On 12/04/2020 Guerrero filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against DMSD Restaurants INC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Timothy Taylor and Richard E. L. Strauss. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judges

Timothy Taylor

Richard E. L. Strauss

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Guerrero, Yajaira

Defendant

DMSD Restaurants Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Anderson, William Geoffrey

Attorney at SULLIVAN LAW GROUP APC

2330 Third Ave

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant Attorneys

Shin, Jenny D.

ROSENSTEIN, ROBERT BRYCE

28600 Mercedes St Suite 100

Temecula, CA 92590

 

Court Documents

Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address

Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address filed by DMSD Restaurants Inc.

Notice of Dismissal by Court SD

Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.

Notice of Settlement of Entire Case

Notice of Unconditional Settlement filed by Guerrero, Yajaira.

Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal filed by Guerrero, Yajaira.

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other filed by Guerrero, Yajaira.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Guerrero, Yajaira.

Defendant's Motion to Stay Proceedings of Duplicate Action

Motion - Other (to stay) filed by DMSD Restaurants Inc.

Declaration of Robert B. Rosenstein In Support Of Motion to Stay Proceedings of A Duplicate Action

Declaration - Other (of Robert B Rosenstein in support of motion to stay) filed by DMSD Restaurants Inc.

Proposed Order

Proposed Order (granting order on motion to stay) submitted by DMSD Restaurants Inc received but not filed on 02/01/2021.

Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time

Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time filed by DMSD Restaurants Inc.

Declaration re Notice of Ex Parte Application for Order

Declaration - Other (of Robert B Rosenstein) filed by DMSD Restaurants Inc.

Declaration In Support Of Ex Parte Application

Declaration - Other (of Jenny D Shin in support of ex parte) filed by DMSD Restaurants Inc.

Proposed Order

Proposed Order (granting order on ex parte) submitted by DMSD Restaurants Inc received but not filed on 02/16/2021.

Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Ex Parte Application

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in support of opposition to ex parte for order shortening time) filed by Guerrero, Yajaira.

Anderson Declaration in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Ex Parte App

Declaration - Other (of William G Anderson in support of opposition to ex parte for order shortening time) filed by Guerrero, Yajaira.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service (memorandum, declaration) filed by Guerrero, Yajaira.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 02/17/2021 08:30:00 AM.

Order After Hearing

Order After Hearing (Re 02/17/2021 ex parte) filed by DMSD Restaurants Inc.

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to DMSD Restaurants Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Guerrero, Yajaira .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal filed by Guerrero, Yajaira. Filed By: Guerrero, Yajaira (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other filed by Guerrero, Yajaira. Filed By: Guerrero, Yajaira (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Guerrero, Yajaira. Filed By: Guerrero, Yajaira (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/29/2021 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-75 Richard E. L. Strauss was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketMotion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 05/28/2021 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in C-75 Richard E. L. Strauss was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Unconditional Settlement filed by Guerrero, Yajaira. Filed By: Guerrero, Yajaira (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketConsent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address filed by DMSD Restaurants Inc. Filed By: DMSD Restaurants Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order (granting order on motion to stay) submitted by DMSD Restaurants Inc received but not filed on 02/01/2021. Filed By: DMSD Restaurants Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Related Case filed by DMSD Restaurants Inc. Filed By: DMSD Restaurants Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by DMSD Restaurants Inc. Filed By: DMSD Restaurants Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/11/2021 at 09:45:00 AM at Central in C-72 Timothy Taylor.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Guerrero, Yajaira. Refers to: DMSD Restaurants Inc Filed By: Guerrero, Yajaira (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Guerrero, Yajaira. Refers to: DMSD Restaurants Inc Filed By: Guerrero, Yajaira (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Guerrero, Yajaira. Refers to: DMSD Restaurants Inc Filed By: Guerrero, Yajaira (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Taylor, Timothy.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DMSD Restaurants Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Anderson, William Geoffrey