This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 07/13/2020 at 06:31:19 (UTC).

Guardianship of Akyler Nathan Magante

Case Summary

On 07/10/2020 Guardianship of Akyler Nathan Magante was filed as a Probate - Guardianship lawsuit. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeffrey Bostwick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Guardianship

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Jeffrey Bostwick

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Guardian Ad Litems

Pingleton, Teri Jo

Pingleton, Ernest Glen

Minor

Magante, Akyler Nathan

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2020
  • HearingLocation: 504; Event Type: Petition for Appointment of General Guardian - Petition for Appointment of Guardian of Minor(s) - Person Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • HearingLocation: 504; Event Type: Petition for Appointment of Temporary Guardian - Petition for Appointment of Temporary Guardian of Person Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Guardian of Minor(s) - Person Only filed by Pingleton, Teri Jo; Pingleton, Ernest Glen. Refers to: Magante, Akyler; Pingleton, Ernest; Pingleton, Teri Filed By: Pingleton, Teri Jo (Petitioner); Pingleton, Ernest Glen (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketConfidential Guardian Screening Form filed by Pingleton, Teri Jo; Pingleton, Ernest Glen. Filed By: Pingleton, Teri Jo (Petitioner); Pingleton, Ernest Glen (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketDeclaration Under Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction and Enforcement Act (UCCJEA) filed by Pingleton, Teri Jo; Pingleton, Ernest Glen. Filed By: Pingleton, Teri Jo (Petitioner); Pingleton, Ernest Glen (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketDuties of Guardian filed by Pingleton, Teri Jo; Pingleton, Ernest Glen. Filed By: Pingleton, Teri Jo (Petitioner); Pingleton, Ernest Glen (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketConfidential Guardian Screening Form filed by Pingleton, Ernest Glen; Pingleton, Teri Jo. Filed By: Pingleton, Ernest Glen (Petitioner); Pingleton, Teri Jo (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketConsent of Proposed Guardian, Nomination of Guardian, and Consent to Appointment of Guardian and Waiver of Notice filed by Pingleton, Ernest Glen; Pingleton, Teri Jo. Filed By: Pingleton, Ernest Glen (Petitioner); Pingleton, Teri Jo (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketOrder Directing or Waiving Investigation (Non-Relative) filed by Pingleton, Ernest Glen; Pingleton, Teri Jo. Filed By: Pingleton, Ernest Glen (Petitioner); Pingleton, Teri Jo (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Temporary Guardian of Person Only filed by Pingleton, Ernest Glen; Pingleton, Teri Jo. Refers to: Magante, Akyler Filed By: Pingleton, Ernest Glen (Petitioner); Pingleton, Teri Jo (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Bostwick, Jeffrey.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of General Guardian scheduled for 11/04/2020 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in 504 Jeffrey Bostwick.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Temporary Guardian scheduled for 07/15/2020 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in 504 Jeffrey Bostwick.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketThe Petition for Appointment of Temporary Guardian was rescheduled to 07/22/2020 at 01:30:00 PM in 504 before Jeffrey Bostwick at Central.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Temporary Guardian scheduled for 07/22/2020 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in 504 Jeffrey Bostwick.

    Read MoreRead Less