This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 12/03/2021 at 09:28:40 (UTC).

GRULLON vs CAMBEROS

Case Summary

On 04/06/2021 GRULLON filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CAMBEROS. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Matthew C. Braner. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Matthew C. Braner

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Grullon, Ricardo

Defendants

Camberos, Issac A

DPR Construction; ESA : DPR Construction Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Cronin, Jeremy R

Attorney at JUREWITZ LAW GROUP

600 B Street Siote 1450

San Diego, CA 92101

Figueroa, Jessica

Attorney at JUREWITZ LAW GROUP

600 B St Suite 300

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant Attorney

Kenny, Eugene P

Attorney at GRIMM VRANJES GREER STEPHAN & BRIDGMAN LLP

750 B Street 1200

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Grullon, Ricardo. Refers to: Camberos, Issac

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Grullon, Ricardo. Refers to: Camberos, Issac

Complaint

Complaint filed by Grullon, Ricardo. Refers to: Camberos, Issac

Amendment to Complaint

Amendment to Complaint/Cross-Complaint naming Doe (Doe 1) filed by Grullon, Ricardo. Refers to: DPR Construction Inc

Notice of Change of Address

Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by DPR Construction; Camberos, Issac A.

Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint

Answer filed by DPR Construction; Camberos, Issac A.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference rescheduled to 04/15/2022 at 10:30:00 AM in C-60 before Matthew C. Braner at Central.

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from Sturgeon,Eddie to Braner,Matthew effective 11/11/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-60; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference reassigned to Braner, Matthew for 02/25/2022 at 10:30:00 AM in C-60 at Central.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase reassigned from Sturgeon,Eddie to Braner,Matthew effective 11/11/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference rescheduled to 04/15/2022 at 10:30:00 AM in C-60 before Matthew C. Braner at Central.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by DPR Construction; Camberos, Issac A. Filed By: DPR Construction (Defendant); Camberos, Issac A (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by DPR Construction; Camberos, Issac A. Filed By: DPR Construction (Defendant); Camberos, Issac A (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint/Cross-Complaint naming Doe (Doe 1) filed by Grullon, Ricardo. Refers to: DPR Construction Filed By: Grullon, Ricardo (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 02/25/2022 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-67 Eddie C Sturgeon.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Grullon, Ricardo. Refers to: Camberos, Issac; DPR Construction Filed By: Grullon, Ricardo (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Grullon, Ricardo. Refers to: Camberos, Issac Filed By: Grullon, Ricardo (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Grullon, Ricardo. Refers to: Camberos, Issac Filed By: Grullon, Ricardo (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Sturgeon, Eddie.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less