Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 08/18/2020 at 12:37:06 (UTC).

Grubbs vs Pulte Homes Corporation

Case Summary

On 03/25/2019 Grubbs filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against Pulte Homes Corporation. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ronald L. Styn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ronald L. Styn

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Schwestka, Jon O

Grenus, Robert

THE LABAUVE FAMILY TRUST

Kruckeberg, John

Yao, Junfang

THE MATTHEW F MESSOLINE & CYNTHIA L KAO TRUST

Grubbs, Michael F

Atanassova, Sofia

Smith, Stephen Michael

Messoline, Matthew F

Koesling, Markus

Dwarakanath, Sundararam

Gibbons, Eli

Gill, Sally A

Mitchell, Brittany

Dunphy, Corey R

Nguyen, Dien

Garcia, Kevin

Hembree-Bey, Elaine Beribos

THE RICH FAMILY TRUST

136 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Garcia, Israel E

2800 Donald Douglas Loop N

Santa Monica, CA 90405

Arreguin, Mark A

Attorney at GARCIA MARSALLI LLP

Other Attorneys

Dorsey, Martha J

Attorney at KOELLER NEBEKER CARLSON & HALUCK LLP

Stein, Jacqueline F

Attorney at FREDERICKSON ET AL LLP

Thaeler, Kent H

Welch, Stephen B

Attorney at LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

Letofsky, Larry D

Attorney at LETOFSKY MCCLAIN

DOVE, MARK S

Attorney at MORROW & WHITE

SILVA, DIRK E

Morrow, William D

Attorney at MORROW & WHITE

Sims, Bob D Jr

Attorney at SIMS LAWRENCE & ARRUTI

SHERMAN, LEE A

Rodriguez, Amanda E

Attorney at SKEBBA ISAAC & BUECHLER One MacArthur Place

Printz, Matthew H

Attorney at MURCHISON & CUMMING LLP

BLAKELY, JOHN R

Shields, Mark D.

BLAKE, KIMBERLY A

Everett, Seymour B.

Attorney at EVERETT DOREY LLP

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - as to Oasis Glass

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party (as to Oasis Glass Inc ONLY) filed by PULTE HOMES CORPORATION.

Complaint in Intervention of Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company (In Re: Xcel Building Group, Inc., A Suspended California Corporation)

Complaint in Intervention filed by Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company.

Cross Defendant Creative Stone MFG., Inc. dba Coronado Stone Products, Erroneously sues as Coronado Stone Products Notice of Posting Jury Fees

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Creative Stone MFG Inc.

NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL FOR SURECRAFT DOOR & HARDWARE, INC.

Association of Attorney filed by SURECRAFT DOOR & HARDWARE INC.

CROSS-DEFENDANT CREATIVE STONE MFG., INC. dba CORONADO STONE PRODUCTS DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 631

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit (and Demand for Jury Trial) filed by Creative Stone MFG Inc.

Notice of Entry of Dismissal as to J GINGER MASONRY, LP aka GINGER MASONRY, LP ONLY

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed by PULTE HOMES CORPORATION.

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice as to Innovative Drywall Systems Only

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party (NOT ENTERED) filed by PULTE HOMES CORPORATION. Refers to: INNOVATIVE WALL SYSTEMS INC

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by PULTE HOMES CORPORATION.

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - INNOVATIVE WALL SYSTEMS, INC. dba ALTA DRYWALL ONLY

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party (as to INNOVATIVE WALL SYSTEMS INC dba ALTA DRYWALL ONLY) filed by PULTE HOMES CORPORATION.

Proof of Service on BUILDER SERVICES GROUP, INC dba GUY EVANS CONTRACTORS SERVICES

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by PULTE HOMES CORPORATION. Refers to: BUILDER SERVICES GROUP INC

ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT OF PULTE HOME COMPANY, LLC BY CROSS-DEFENDANT ALCAL SPECIALTY CONTRACTING, INC. dba ALCAL ARCADE CONTRACTING INC.

Answer filed by ALCAL SPECIALTY CONTRACTING INC.

ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT OF PULTE HOME COMPANY, LLC BY CROSS-DEFENDANT BLACK HAWK ELECTRIC COMPANY, INC.

Answer filed by BLACK HAWK ELECTRIC COMPANY INC.

ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT OF PULTE HOME COMPANY, LLC BY CROSS-DEFENDANT LEONARD'S CARPET SERVICE, INC.

Answer filed by LEONARD'S CARPET SERVICE INC.

Case Management Order

Case Management Order (Signed as Modified. Trial Dates are TBD.) filed by CLARKE, AL.

ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT BY PULTE HOME COMPANY, LLC SUCCESSOR BY CONVERSION OF PULTE HOME CORPORATION

Answer filed by PULTE HOMES CORPORATION.

Case Management Order

Case Management Order submitted by Li Ma, Alice Chia; Rich, Alicia; Patnaik, Ananya; Burack, Angela; Arunachalam, Babu; Lian, Bing; Mitchell, Brittany; Coats, Cheryl L; Lange, Christie; Zhang, Chunsheng;OTHERS received but not filed on 01/30/2020.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Civil Case Management Conference was rescheduled to 02/07/2020 at 10:30:00 AM in C-74 before Ronald L. Styn at Central.

Stipulation - Other

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (Stipulation to File Second Amended Complaint) filed by Li Ma, Alice Chia; Rich, Alicia; Patnaik, Ananya; Arunachalam, Babu; Mitchell, Brittany; Zhang, Chunsheng; Mitchell, Collin; Dunphy, Corey R; Kao, Cynthia L; Hickman, Dale;OTHERS.

145 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2020
  • HearingLocation: C-74; Event Type: Discovery Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • HearingLocation: C-74; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • HearingLocation: C-74; Event Type: Ex Parte

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents (for order shortening time to hear motion to compel) filed by PULTE HOMES CORPORATION. Filed By: PULTE HOMES CORPORATION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (of Sarah P Long in support of ex parte) filed by PULTE HOMES CORPORATION. Filed By: PULTE HOMES CORPORATION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service (ex parte, declaration) filed by PULTE HOMES CORPORATION. Filed By: PULTE HOMES CORPORATION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney filed by SURECRAFT DOOR & HARDWARE INC. Filed By: SURECRAFT DOOR & HARDWARE INC (Cross - Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Allowing Service on the Secretary of State filed by PULTE HOMES CORPORATION. Filed By: PULTE HOMES CORPORATION (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication for Order to Serve the Secretary of State filed by PULTE HOMES CORPORATION. Filed By: PULTE HOMES CORPORATION (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by PULTE HOMES CORPORATION. Filed By: PULTE HOMES CORPORATION (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
171 More Docket Entries
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Li Ma, Alice Chia; Rich, Alicia; Patnaik, Ananya; Arunachalam, Babu; Mitchell, Brittany; Zhang, Chunsheng; Mitchell, Collin; Dunphy, Corey R; Kao, Cynthia L; Hickman, Dale;OTHERS. Filed By: Li Ma, Alice Chia (Plaintiff); Rich, Alicia (Plaintiff); Patnaik, Ananya (Plaintiff); Arunachalam, Babu (Plaintiff); Mitchell, Brittany (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Complaint (first) filed by Li Ma, Alice Chia; Rich, Alicia; Patnaik, Ananya; Arunachalam, Babu; Mitchell, Brittany; Zhang, Chunsheng; Mitchell, Collin; Dunphy, Corey R; Kao, Cynthia L; Hickman, Dale;OTHERS. Refers to: PULTE HOMES CORPORATION Filed By: Li Ma, Alice Chia (Plaintiff); Rich, Alicia (Plaintiff); Patnaik, Ananya (Plaintiff); Arunachalam, Babu (Plaintiff); Mitchell, Brittany (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons (first amended complaint) filed by Li Ma, Alice Chia; Rich, Alicia; Patnaik, Ananya; Arunachalam, Babu; Mitchell, Brittany; Zhang, Chunsheng; Mitchell, Collin; Dunphy, Corey R; Kao, Cynthia L; Hickman, Dale;OTHERS. Filed By: Li Ma, Alice Chia (Plaintiff); Rich, Alicia (Plaintiff); Patnaik, Ananya (Plaintiff); Arunachalam, Babu (Plaintiff); Mitchell, Brittany (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 09/13/2019 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-74 Ronald L. Styn.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Grubbs, Michael F; Grubbs, Priscilla F; Bush, Dee L; Moyer, Payton S; Moyer, Taylor K; Arunachalam, Babu; Chandramouli, Lalitha; Hembree-Bey, Khary; Hembree-Bey, Elaine Beribos; Busalacchi, Peter L;OTHERS. Refers to: PULTE HOMES CORPORATION Filed By: Grubbs, Michael F (Plaintiff); Grubbs, Priscilla F (Plaintiff); Bush, Dee L (Plaintiff); Moyer, Payton S (Plaintiff); Moyer, Taylor K (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Grubbs, Michael F; Grubbs, Priscilla F; Bush, Dee L; Moyer, Payton S; Moyer, Taylor K; Arunachalam, Babu; Chandramouli, Lalitha; Hembree-Bey, Khary; Hembree-Bey, Elaine Beribos; Busalacchi, Peter L;OTHERS. Refers to: PULTE HOMES CORPORATION Filed By: Grubbs, Michael F (Plaintiff); Grubbs, Priscilla F (Plaintiff); Bush, Dee L (Plaintiff); Moyer, Payton S (Plaintiff); Moyer, Taylor K (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Grubbs, Michael F; Grubbs, Priscilla F; Bush, Dee L; Moyer, Payton S; Moyer, Taylor K; Arunachalam, Babu; Chandramouli, Lalitha; Hembree-Bey, Khary; Hembree-Bey, Elaine Beribos; Busalacchi, Peter L;OTHERS. Refers to: PULTE HOMES CORPORATION Filed By: Grubbs, Michael F (Plaintiff); Grubbs, Priscilla F (Plaintiff); Bush, Dee L (Plaintiff); Moyer, Payton S (Plaintiff); Moyer, Taylor K (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Styn, Ronald.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE RICH FAMILY TRUST is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thaeler, Kent H

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BLAKELY JOHN R

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DORSEY, MARTHA J