This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 01/15/2022 at 07:06:40 (UTC).

Groff vs Worke

Case Summary

On 11/16/2021 Groff filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Worke. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is James A Mangione. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

James A Mangione

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Groff, George

Groff, Martina

Defendants

Rasier CA LLC

Uber Technologies Inc

Worke, Mesfin

Rasier LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Najar, Charlotte

1899 Mckee St

San Diego, CA 92110

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

E-filing transaction partially accepted.

Complaint

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 5]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 5]

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Groff, George; Groff, Martina. Refers to: Worke, Mesfin; Uber Technologies Inc; Rasier CA LLC

Complaint

Complaint filed by Groff, George; Groff, Martina. Refers to: Worke, Mesfin; Uber Technologies Inc; Rasier CA LLC

Amended Complaint

Amended Complaint (FIRST AMENDED) filed by Groff, George; Groff, Martina. Refers to: Worke, Mesfin; Uber Technologies Inc; Rasier CA LLC; Rasier LLC

Original Summons

Original Summons (ON FIRST AMENDED) filed by Groff, George; Groff, Martina.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-75; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons (ON FIRST AMENDED) filed by Groff, George; Groff, Martina. Filed By: Groff, George (Plaintiff); Groff, Martina (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Complaint (FIRST AMENDED) filed by Groff, George; Groff, Martina. Refers to: Worke, Mesfin; Uber Technologies Inc; Rasier CA LLC; Rasier LLC Filed By: Groff, George (Plaintiff); Groff, Martina (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/22/2022 at 10:15:00 AM at Central in C-75 James A Mangione.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 6]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 6]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-filing transaction partially accepted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Groff, George; Groff, Martina. Refers to: Worke, Mesfin; Uber Technologies Inc; Rasier CA LLC Filed By: Groff, George (Plaintiff); Groff, Martina (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Groff, George; Groff, Martina. Refers to: Worke, Mesfin; Uber Technologies Inc; Rasier CA LLC Filed By: Groff, George (Plaintiff); Groff, Martina (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Mangione, James.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Rasier-CA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where RASIER LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where UBER TECHNOLOGIES INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Najar, Charlotte