This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 07/21/2020 at 02:09:37 (UTC).

Grigg vs City of Solana Beach

Case Summary

On 09/18/2019 Grigg filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against City of Solana Beach. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert P Dahlquist. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************O-NC

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Robert P Dahlquist

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Grigg, Virginia

Defendants

American Assets Trust

City of Solana Beach

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NEVELL, TODD F

Attorney at SCOLINOS SHELDON & NEVELL

Defendant Attorneys

Reeder, David R

Attorney at MANNING & KASS ELLROD RAMIREZ TRESTER LLP

Mitchell, Carrie L

Attorney at MCDOUGAL LOVE BOEHMER FOLEY LYON CANLAS

 

Court Documents

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Civil Jury Trial rescheduled to 06/04/2021 at 08:30:00 AM in N-29 before Robert P Dahlquist at North County.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) rescheduled to 05/21/2021 at 10:00:00 AM in N-29 before Robert P Dahlquist at North County.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by City of Solana Beach.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by City of Solana Beach.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by American Assets Trust.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by American Assets Trust.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Grigg, Virginia.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Grigg, Virginia.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 02/21/2020 09:00:00 AM.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Answer

Answer (to Complaint; Demand for Jury Trial) filed by American Assets Trust.

Answer

Answer filed by City of Solana Beach.

Complaint

Complaint filed by Grigg, Virginia. Refers to: City of Solana Beach; American Assets Trust

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Grigg, Virginia. Refers to: City of Solana Beach; American Assets Trust

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Grigg, Virginia. Refers to: City of Solana Beach; American Assets Trust

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2021
  • HearingLocation: N-29; Event Type: Civil Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • HearingLocation: N-29; Event Type: Trial Readiness Conference (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial rescheduled to 06/04/2021 at 08:30:00 AM in N-29 before Robert P Dahlquist at North County.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTrial Readiness Conference (Civil) rescheduled to 05/21/2021 at 10:00:00 AM in N-29 before Robert P Dahlquist at North County.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketPursuant to California Rules of Court 3.714, the Court, after having met and conferred with counsel, categorizes this case as one that will be disposed of within 18 months

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial scheduled for 11/30/2020 at 08:30AM before Judge Robert P Dahlquist.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketTrial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 11/20/2020 at 10:00AM before Judge Robert P Dahlquist.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketJury demanded by all parties.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketThis matter is referred to Mediation per stipulation of the parties.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 02/21/2020 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by City of Solana Beach. Filed By: City of Solana Beach (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer (to Complaint; Demand for Jury Trial) filed by American Assets Trust. Filed By: American Assets Trust (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by City of Solana Beach. Filed By: City of Solana Beach (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Grigg, Virginia. Refers to: City of Solana Beach; American Assets Trust Filed By: Grigg, Virginia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Grigg, Virginia. Refers to: City of Solana Beach; American Assets Trust Filed By: Grigg, Virginia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Grigg, Virginia. Refers to: City of Solana Beach; American Assets Trust Filed By: Grigg, Virginia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Dahlquist, Robert.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 02/21/2020 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-29 Robert P Dahlquist.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Assets Trust Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MITCHELL CARRIE LYNN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer REEDER, DAVID R.