This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 11/27/2021 at 03:49:18 (UTC).

Griffith vs LEGOLAND CALIFORNIA LLC

Case Summary

On 09/16/2020 Griffith filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against LEGOLAND CALIFORNIA LLC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Jacqueline M. Stern and Cynthia A. Freeland. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************O-NC

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judges

Jacqueline M. Stern

Cynthia A. Freeland

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Griffith, Danny William

Defendant

Legoland California LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ghermezian, Raymond

Attorney at RAYMOND GHERMEZIAN A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

3435 Wilshire Blvd Suite #1800

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Defendant Attorney

Lewis, Rosemarie S

 

Court Documents

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Griffith, Danny William. Refers to: Legoland California LLC

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Griffith, Danny William. Refers to: Legoland California LLC

Complaint

Complaint filed by Griffith, Danny William. Refers to: Legoland California LLC

Answer

Answer filed by Legoland California LLC.

Order to Show Cause (Non-Sanctions) SD

Order to Show Cause (Non-Sanctions) SD generated.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 03/05/2021 09:00:00 AM.

Case Management Statement (Case Management)

Case Management Statement filed by Griffith, Danny William.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Legoland California LLC.

Proposed Order Granting Stipulation To Continue Trial Date And Related Dates

Order - Other filed by Legoland California LLC.

Stipulation To Continue Trial Date And Related Dates

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due filed by Legoland California LLC; Griffith, Danny William.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 04/16/2021 09:00:00 AM.

Case Management Statement (Case Management)

Case Management Statement filed by Griffith, Danny William.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Legoland California LLC.

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2022
  • HearingLocation: N-27; Event Type: Civil Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • HearingLocation: N-27; Event Type: Trial Readiness Conference (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketThe Civil Jury Trial was rescheduled to 06/03/2022 at 08:30:00 AM in N-27 before Cynthia A. Freeland at North County.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial scheduled for 06/03/2022 at 08:30:00 AM at North County in N-27 Cynthia A. Freeland.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketThe Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) was rescheduled to 05/13/2022 at 10:00:00 AM in N-27 before Cynthia A. Freeland at North County.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketTrial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 05/13/2022 at 10:00:00 AM at North County in N-27 Cynthia A. Freeland.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation - Other - Fee Due filed by Legoland California LLC; Griffith, Danny William. Filed By: Legoland California LLC (Defendant); Griffith, Danny William (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder - Other filed by Legoland California LLC. Filed By: Legoland California LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketOSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed set for 04/16/21 at 9:00 am vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketPursuant to California Rules of Court 3.714, the Court, after having met and conferred with counsel, categorizes this case as one that will be disposed of within 18 months

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 11/07/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference reassigned to Freeland, Cynthia for 03/05/2021 at 09:00:00 AM in N-27 at North County.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2020
  • DocketCase reassigned from Stern,Jacqueline to Freeland,Cynthia effective 11/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Legoland California LLC. Filed By: Legoland California LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/05/2021 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-27 Jacqueline M. Stern.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Griffith, Danny William. Refers to: Legoland California LLC Filed By: Griffith, Danny William (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Griffith, Danny William. Refers to: Legoland California LLC Filed By: Griffith, Danny William (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Griffith, Danny William. Refers to: Legoland California LLC Filed By: Griffith, Danny William (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Stern, Jacqueline.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Legoland California LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEWIS ROSEMARIE SUAZO