Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 08/17/2020 at 10:06:40 (UTC).

Gresham vs Naylor Construction INC

Case Summary

On 07/31/2019 Gresham filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against Naylor Construction INC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ronald L. Styn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ronald L. Styn

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Gartland, Maria Carmen

Gresham, Derek

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Naylor Construction Inc

KARI ANNE JOHNSON LLC

JOHNSON, KARI ANNE

KAJ PROPERTIES I LLC

KARI ANNE JOHNSON LLC II

KAJ PROPERTIES I LLC; AKA : KAJ Properties II LLC

BZ PLUMBING ENTERPRISES INC

Archibald Inc; DBA : Affordable Rain Gutters

Archibald Inc

ROCKSTAR GARAGE DOOR SERVICES INC

DAN RAY STUCCO INC

FIREPLACES PLUS INC

OMEGA DRYWALL CONSTRUCTION INC

SCHULER ELECTRIC INC

GEODE DESIGN + BUILD LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Shiu, Loren K

Attorney at THE NAUMANN LAW FIRM PC

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Berman, Daniel A

Mallon, Andrew J

Attorney at WOOD SMITH HENING & BERMAN LLP

Sullivan, Michael Eugene

Attorney at ROBINSON SHARP SULLIVAN & BRUST

Sharp, Stephanie Teresa

Attorney at ROBISON SHARP SULLIVAN & BRUST

Jeffery, Mona J

Attorney at JEFFERY & GROSFELD LLP

DeCamp, Camille Joy

Attorney at BERG HILL GREENLEAF RUSCITTI LLP

 

Court Documents

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) rescheduled to 10/08/2021 at 09:30:00 AM in C-74 before Ronald L. Styn at Central.

Answer to Naylor Construction's Cross-Complaint

Answer filed by Archibald Inc.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Status Conference (Civil) was rescheduled to 05/07/2021 at 10:30:00 AM in C-74 before Ronald L. Styn at Central.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Naylor Construction Inc.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Naylor Construction Inc.

Case Management Order

Case Management Order submitted by Gresham, Derek; Gartland, Maria Carmen received but not filed on 02/11/2020.

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF BZ PLUMBING ENTERPRISES, INC.

Cross-Complaint filed by BZ PLUMBING ENTERPRISES INC.

SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT

Original Summons (To Cross Complaint) filed by BZ PLUMBING ENTERPRISES INC.

Answer to Cross-Complaint

Answer filed by Naylor Construction Inc.

Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone

Notice of Intent to Appear Telephonically filed by KAJ PROPERTIES I LLC; JOHNSON, KARI ANNE; KARI ANNE JOHNSON LLC; KARI ANNE JOHNSON LLC II.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 01/03/2020 10:30:00 AM.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.

Answer to First Amended Complaint

Answer filed by KAJ PROPERTIES I LLC; JOHNSON, KARI ANNE; KARI ANNE JOHNSON LLC; KARI ANNE JOHNSON LLC II.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by KAJ PROPERTIES I LLC; JOHNSON, KARI ANNE; KARI ANNE JOHNSON LLC; KARI ANNE JOHNSON LLC II.

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

E-filing transaction partially accepted.

Notice of Intent to Appear Telephonically

Notice of Intent to Appear Telephonically filed by KAJ PROPERTIES I LLC; JOHNSON, KARI ANNE; KARI ANNE JOHNSON LLC; KARI ANNE JOHNSON LLC II.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-74; Event Type: Civil Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-74; Event Type: Trial Readiness Conference (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-74; Event Type: Status Conference (Civil) - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Naylor Construction Inc. Filed By: Naylor Construction Inc (Cross - Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCross-Complaint filed by Archibald Inc. Refers to: Naylor Construction Inc Filed By: Archibald Inc (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketStatus Conference (Civil) date was restored to 07/10/2020 at 10:30:00 AM in C-74 before Ronald L. Styn at Central.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketThe Status Conference (Civil) was rescheduled to 05/07/2021 at 10:30:00 AM in C-74 before Ronald L. Styn at Central.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketStatus Conference (Civil) scheduled for 05/07/2021 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-74 Ronald L. Styn.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Archibald Inc. Filed By: Archibald Inc (Cross - Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial rescheduled to 10/15/2021 at 09:30:00 AM in C-74 before Ronald L. Styn at Central.

    Read MoreRead Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Complaint (FIRST) filed by Gresham, Derek; Gartland, Maria Carmen. Refers to: Naylor Construction Inc; KARI ANNE JOHNSON LLC II; KARI ANNE JOHNSON LLC; KAJ PROPERTIES I LLC; JOHNSON, KARI ANNE Filed By: Gresham, Derek (Plaintiff); Gartland, Maria Carmen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons (FIRST AMENDED) filed by Gresham, Derek; Gartland, Maria Carmen. Filed By: Gresham, Derek (Plaintiff); Gartland, Maria Carmen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/03/2020 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-74 Ronald L. Styn.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Gresham, Derek; Gartland, Maria Carmen. Refers to: Naylor Construction Inc Filed By: Gresham, Derek (Plaintiff); Gartland, Maria Carmen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Gresham, Derek; Gartland, Maria Carmen. Refers to: Naylor Construction Inc Filed By: Gresham, Derek (Plaintiff); Gartland, Maria Carmen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Gresham, Derek; Gartland, Maria Carmen. Refers to: Naylor Construction Inc Filed By: Gresham, Derek (Plaintiff); Gartland, Maria Carmen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Styn, Ronald.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Archibald Inc; DBA : Affordable Rain Gutters is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DECAMP CAMILLE JOY

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BERMAN DANIEL ADLAI