This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 11/29/2021 at 05:03:19 (UTC).

Graves vs LEOLAND CALIFORNIA LLC

Case Summary

On 12/21/2020 Graves filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against LEOLAND CALIFORNIA LLC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Cynthia A. Freeland. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************O-NC

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Cynthia A. Freeland

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GRAVES, MICHELLE

Defendants

Leoland California LLC

Legoland California LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Woods, Briny Adam

Attorney at WOODS AND WILLIFORD P C

16520 Bake Pkwy Suite 260

Irvine, CA 92618

Defendant Attorney

Lewis, Rosemarie S

Attorney at BORTON PETRINI LLP

626 Wilshire Blvd Suite 975

Los Angeles, CA 90017

 

Court Documents

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Summons

Original Summons filed by GRAVES, MICHELLE.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by GRAVES, MICHELLE.

Complaint

Complaint filed by GRAVES, MICHELLE. Refers to: Leoland California LLC

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Civil Case Management Conference was rescheduled to 11/05/2021 at 09:00:00 AM in N-27 before Cynthia A. Freeland at North County.

DEFENDANT LEGOLAND CALIFORNIA LLCS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF MICHELLE GRAVES COMPLAINT

Answer filed by Legoland California LLC.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit (Notices)

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Legoland California LLC.

Notice to Filing Party SD

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit submitted by Legoland California LLC rejected on 11/12/2021.

Mediator Selection Form

Mediator Selection Form filed by GRAVES, MICHELLE.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 11/05/2021 09:00:00 AM.

Case Management Statement (Case Management)

Case Management Statement filed by Legoland California LLC.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by GRAVES, MICHELLE.

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2022
  • HearingLocation: N-27; Event Type: Civil Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • HearingLocation: N-27; Event Type: Trial Readiness Conference (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketReturned Mail filed by The Superior Court of San Diego. Refers to: GRAVES, MICHELLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Legoland California LLC. Filed By: Legoland California LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMediator Selection Form filed by GRAVES, MICHELLE. Filed By: GRAVES, MICHELLE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketStatus of Mediation process changed to Pending.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Jury Fee Deposit submitted by Legoland California LLC rejected on 11/12/2021. Filed By: Legoland California LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketPursuant to California Rules of Court 3.714, the Court, after having met and conferred with counsel, categorizes this case as one that will be disposed of within 18 months

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketTrial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 05/06/2022 at 10:00AM before Judge Cynthia A. Freeland.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial scheduled for 05/27/2022 at 08:30AM before Judge Cynthia A. Freeland.

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Legoland California LLC. Filed By: Legoland California LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketThe Civil Case Management Conference was rescheduled to 11/05/2021 at 09:00:00 AM in N-27 before Cynthia A. Freeland at North County.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/05/2021 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-27 Cynthia A. Freeland.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/15/2021 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-27 Cynthia A. Freeland.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by GRAVES, MICHELLE. Refers to: Legoland California LLC Filed By: GRAVES, MICHELLE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by GRAVES, MICHELLE. Filed By: GRAVES, MICHELLE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by GRAVES, MICHELLE. Filed By: GRAVES, MICHELLE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Freeland, Cynthia.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Legoland California LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEWIS ROSEMARIE SUAZO