This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/02/2019 at 16:21:06 (UTC).

GRANITE STATE INSURANCE COMPANY vs. AVV General Contractors Inc

Case Summary

On 11/12/2010 GRANITE STATE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against AVV General Contractors Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, South County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************C-SC

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GRANITE STATE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

AVV GENERAL CONTRACTORS INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WEISS, MICHAEL I

Attorney at LERNER & WEISS APC

21600 Oxnard Street 1130

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

 

Court Documents

Notice to Filing Party SD

Correspondence (Ck # 12384 - $25) submitted by GRANITE STATE INSURANCE COMPANY rejected on 06/14/2017.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Judgment Debtor Exam (Civil) heard 12/02/2011 09:15:00 AM.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Judgment Debtor Exam (Civil) heard 02/17/2012 09:15:00 AM.

Notice to Filing Party SD

Writ of Execution submitted by GRANITE STATE INSURANCE COMPANY rejected on 09/26/2011.

Notice to Filing Party SD

Writ of Execution submitted by GRANITE STATE INSURANCE COMPANY rejected on 07/22/2014. Refers to: AVV General Contractors Inc

Case File Contents as of 06/05/17 - volume 1 of 1

Case File Contents as of 06/05/17 - volume 1 of 1

Notice to Filing Party SD

Writ of Execution submitted by GRANITE STATE INSURANCE COMPANY rejected on 11/01/2011.

Notice to Filing Party SD

Writ of Execution submitted by GRANITE STATE INSURANCE COMPANY rejected on 04/02/2014.

Notice to Filing Party SD

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest (and Writ of Execution) submitted by GRANITE STATE INSURANCE COMPANY rejected on 08/02/2011.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case File Contents as of 06/05/17 - volume 1 of 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Correspondence (Ck # 12384 - $25) submitted by GRANITE STATE INSURANCE COMPANY rejected on 06/14/2017. Filed By: GRANITE STATE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2015
  • Stale dated check for issued Writ 1/29/2015 returned. New check requested.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2015
  • Writ of Execution issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2014
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by GRANITE STATE INSURANCE COMPANY. Refers to: AVV General Contractors Inc Filed By: GRANITE STATE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2014
  • *****WRIT RECEIVED*****

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution submitted by GRANITE STATE INSURANCE COMPANY rejected on 07/22/2014. Refers to: AVV General Contractors Inc Filed By: GRANITE STATE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2014
  • *****Writ Received*****

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution submitted by GRANITE STATE INSURANCE COMPANY rejected on 04/02/2014. Filed By: GRANITE STATE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2013
  • WRIT RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 04/14/2011
  • Location changed from Civil Business Office to Dept. 4.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2011
  • **Default and/or Judgment Papers Received** Court judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2011
  • The default filed by GRANITE STATE INSURANCE COMPANY was entered as to AVV General Contractors Inc on Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 . Override feature used.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2011
  • Request for Entry of Default filed by GRANITE STATE INSURANCE COMPANY. Refers to: AVV General Contractors Inc Filed By: GRANITE STATE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2010
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by GRANITE STATE INSURANCE COMPANY. Refers to: AVV General Contractors Inc Filed By: GRANITE STATE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2010
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Cannon, William.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2010
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2010
  • Original Summons filed by GRANITE STATE INSURANCE COMPANY. Refers to: AVV General Contractors Inc Filed By: GRANITE STATE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2010
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by GRANITE STATE INSURANCE COMPANY. Refers to: AVV General Contractors Inc Filed By: GRANITE STATE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2010
  • Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by GRANITE STATE INSURANCE COMPANY. Refers to: AVV General Contractors Inc Filed By: GRANITE STATE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.