This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/24/2018 at 04:05:35 (UTC).

Gorgees vs. Attisha

Case Summary

On 04/27/2012 Gorgees filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Attisha. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, East County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is EDDIE C STURGEON. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************A-EC

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    East County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

EDDIE C STURGEON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gorgees, Sameer

Defendant

Attisha, Jini

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Salmu, Scott N

Attorney at SALMU LAW FIRM APLC

202 E Main St

El Cajon, CA 92020

Defendant Attorney

GRANT, DANNY R

Attorney at STRATMAN & WILLIAMS ABREGO

Po Box 258829

Oklahoma City, OK 73125-8829

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint filed by Gorgees, Sameer.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Order on Court Fee Waiver

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Granted in Whole) filed by Gorgees, Sameer.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Gorgees, Sameer. Refers to: Attisha, Jini

Certificate of Service

Certificate of Service filed by Gorgees, Sameer.

Answer

Answer filed by Attisha, Jini. Refers to: Gorgees, Sameer

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/12/2012 at 10:30:00 AM at East County in E-15 Joel R. Wohlfeil.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Attisha, Jini.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Attisha, Jini.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 10/12/2012 10:30:00 AM.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from Wohlfeil,Joel to Sturgeon,Eddie effective 11/16/2012

Minute Order

Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Statement of Agreement/Nonagreement - mediation did not take place

Statement of Agreement/Nonagreement - mediation did not take place filed by PLOTKIN, BARRY M. Refers to: Gorgees, Sameer; Attisha, Jini

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Gorgees, Sameer.

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/01/2018
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver, filed by Gorgees, Sameer, on 04/27/2012, has expired.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/01/2018
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver, filed by Gorgees, Sameer, on 04/27/2012, has expired.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2013
  • Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 07/12/2013 at 10:00:00 AM at East County in E-14 Eddie C Sturgeon was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2013
  • Civil Jury Trial scheduled for 07/19/2013 at 08:30:00 AM at East County in E-14 Eddie C Sturgeon was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Gorgees, Sameer. Filed By: Gorgees, Sameer (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2013
  • Status of Mediation process changed to Mediation Not held on 10/12/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Agreement/Nonagreement - mediation did not take place filed by PLOTKIN, BARRY M. Refers to: Gorgees, Sameer; Attisha, Jini

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 05/07/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Service filed by Gorgees, Sameer. Filed By: Gorgees, Sameer (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Gorgees, Sameer. Refers to: Attisha, Jini Filed By: Gorgees, Sameer (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Granted in Whole) filed by Gorgees, Sameer.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2012
  • Request to Waive Court Fees filed by Gorgees, Sameer.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2012
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Wohlfeil, Joel.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2012
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Gorgees, Sameer.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Gorgees, Sameer.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by Gorgees, Sameer.

    Read MoreRead Less