Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 06/03/2021 at 01:48:22 (UTC).

GONZALEZ VS SWEETWATER CAR WASH INC

Case Summary

On 05/06/2021 GONZALEZ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against SWEETWATER CAR WASH INC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Timothy Taylor and Gregory W Pollack. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judges

Timothy Taylor

Gregory W Pollack

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gonzalez, Leonardo

Defendants

STAAB, PETER

Sweetwater Car Wash Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Rastegar, Farzad

Attorney at RASTEGAR LAW GROUP APC

Sherrod, Danielle

Attorney at RASTEGAR LAW GROUP APC

 

Court Documents

Peremptory Challenge

Peremptory Challenge filed by Gonzalez, Leonardo.

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from Judge Taylor, Timothy to Gregory Pollack effective 05/14/2021

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/15/2021 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-71 Gregory W Pollack.

Class Action Complaint

Complaint filed by Gonzalez, Leonardo. Refers to: Sweetwater Car Wash Inc; STAAB, PETER

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Gonzalez, Leonardo. Refers to: Sweetwater Car Wash Inc; STAAB, PETER

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Gonzalez, Leonardo. Refers to: Sweetwater Car Wash Inc; STAAB, PETER

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-71; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/15/2021 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-71 Gregory W Pollack.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase reassigned from Judge Taylor, Timothy to Gregory Pollack effective 05/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/08/2021 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-72 Timothy Taylor was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPeremptory Challenge filed by Gonzalez, Leonardo. Filed By: Gonzalez, Leonardo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/08/2021 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-72 Timothy Taylor.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Gonzalez, Leonardo. Refers to: Sweetwater Car Wash Inc; STAAB, PETER Filed By: Gonzalez, Leonardo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Gonzalez, Leonardo. Refers to: Sweetwater Car Wash Inc; STAAB, PETER Filed By: Gonzalez, Leonardo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Gonzalez, Leonardo. Refers to: Sweetwater Car Wash Inc; STAAB, PETER Filed By: Gonzalez, Leonardo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Taylor, Timothy.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sherrod, Danielle Elizabeth

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RASTEGAR FARZAD