This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 07/22/2019 at 23:01:41 (UTC).

Gonzalez vs San Diego Country Estates Homeowners Association

Case Summary

On 12/09/2015 Gonzalez filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against San Diego Country Estates Homeowners Association. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ROBERT P DAHLQUIST and RONALD F. FRAZIER. The case status is Other - Consolidated.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************O-NC

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Other - Consolidated

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judges

ROBERT P DAHLQUIST

RONALD F. FRAZIER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

RAIMO, LARRY

RAIMO, JENNIFER

HERGENROEATHER, JAMES E

HERGENROEATHER, JANET GARFINKEL

GONZALEZ, IMELDA

GONZALEZ, LUIS

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

SWEITZER, RALPH

SAN DIEGO COUNTRY ESTATES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

SAN DIEGO GAS AND ELECTRIC

SAN DIEGO COUNTRY ESTATES ASSOCIATION

COUNTY OF SAN DIEGO

STATE OF CALIFORNIA, DEPARTMENT OF FORESTRY AND FIRE PROTECTION, CAL FIRE

BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT

SAN DIEGO COUNTRY ESTATES HOME OWNERS ASSOCIATION

Plaintiffs, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

RAIMO, LARRY

RAIMO, JENNIFER

SWEITZER, RALPH

GONZALEZ, IMELDA

SAN DIEGO GAS AND ELECTRIC

GONZALEZ, LUIS

SAN DIEGO COUNTRY ESTATES ASSOCIATION

COUNTY OF SAN DIEGO

UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT

8 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

RICHARDS, JOHN T

Attorney at JOHN T RICHARDS APLC

101 W Broadway 1950

San Diego, CA 92101

Cross Defendant, Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

SWEET, WALLACE H

Attorney at HARTSUYKER STRATMAN & WILLIAMS ABREGO

P O Box 258829

Oklahoma City, OK 73125

SMITH, RAUL OLAMENDI

QUAYLE, ROBERT H IV

Attorney at DALEY & HEFT LLP

462 Stevens Ave #201

Solana Beach, CA 92075

DEAK, THOMAS

Attorney at SAN DIEGO COUNTY COUNSEL

1600 Pacific Highway Room 355

San Diego, CA 92101

SMITH, SANDRA JAMIE

Attorney at BOLES & DI MASCIO

700 Camino Del Rio N

San Diego, CA 92108

SKEES, STEPHANIE M

462 Stevens Avenue 201

Solana Beach, CA 92075

Plaintiff, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

RICHARDS, JOHN T

Attorney at JOHN T RICHARDS APLC

101 W Broadway 1950

San Diego, CA 92101

SWEET, WALLACE H

Attorney at HARTSUYKER STRATMAN & WILLIAMS ABREGO

P O Box 258829

Oklahoma City, OK 73125

SMITH, RAUL OLAMENDI

QUAYLE, ROBERT H IV

Attorney at DALEY & HEFT LLP

462 Stevens Ave #201

Solana Beach, CA 92075

SKEES, STEPHANIE M

462 Stevens Avenue 201

Solana Beach, CA 92075

DEAK, THOMAS

Attorney at SAN DIEGO COUNTY COUNSEL

1600 Pacific Highway Room 355

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Sweitzer, Ralph.

Motion to Strike

Motion to Strike (7/22/16) filed by Sweitzer, Ralph.

Motion - Other

Motion - Other (For Leave to File 2nd Amended Complaint) filed by Gonzalez, Luis; Gonzalez, Imelda; Hergenroeather, Janet Garfinkel; Hergenroeather, James E; Raimo, Larry; Raimo, Jennifer.

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (STIPULATIO TO CONSOLIDATE NOT SIGNED. PROPOSED TRANSFER OF CASES TO JUDGE STURGEON SHOULD BE APPROVED BY JUDGE STURGEON) filed by Gonzalez, Luis.

Opposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations

Opposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations (05/06/16) filed by Gonzalez, Luis.

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Gonzalez, Luis; Gonzalez, Imelda; Hergenroeather, Janet Garfinkel; Hergenroeather, James E; Raimo, Larry; Raimo, Jennifer. Refers to: San Diego Country Estates Association; San Diego Gas and Electric; Sweitzer, Ralph

Answer

Answer (To First Amended Complaint) filed by Sweitzer, Ralph.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 07/08/2016 09:00:00 AM.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 10/14/2016 01:30:00 PM.

Complaint

Complaint filed by Gonzalez, Luis; Gonzalez, Imelda; Hergenroeather, Janet Garfinkel; Hergenroeather, James E; Raimo, Larry; Raimo, Jennifer. Refers to: San Diego Country Estates Association; San Diego Gas and Electric; Sweitzer, Ralph

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement (5/13/16) filed by San Diego Country Estates Association.

Cross-Complaint

Cross-Complaint filed by San Diego Country Estates Association. Refers to: Sweitzer, Ralph; San Diego Gas and Electric

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by San Diego Gas and Electric.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Sweitzer, Ralph.

Amendment to Complaint

Amendment to Complaint filed by Gonzalez, Imelda; Hergenroeather, James E; Hergenroeather, Janet Garfinkel; Raimo, Jennifer; Raimo, Larry; Gonzalez, Luis. Refers to: San Diego Country Estates Association

Motion to Strike

Motion to Strike (5/6/16) filed by Sweitzer, Ralph.

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from Frazier,Ronald to Dahlquist,Robert effective 12/29/2018

61 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case reassigned from Frazier,Ronald to Dahlquist,Robert effective 12/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Agreement/Nonagreement - mediation did not take place filed by DOMINSKI, DEBRA A. Filed By: DOMINSKI, DEBRA A (Mediator)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case reassigned from Dahlquist,Robert to Frazier,Ronald effective 03/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • Cases consolidated on 01/23/2017. 37-2016-00023437-CU-PO-CTL is designated the lead case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 04/28/2017 at 10:00:00 AM at North County in N-29 Robert P Dahlquist was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • Civil Jury Trial scheduled for 05/12/2017 at 08:30:00 AM at North County in N-29 Robert P Dahlquist was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Order - Other (FOR CONSOLIDATION 16-23437) filed by Gonzalez, Luis. Filed By: Gonzalez, Luis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration - Other (DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR CONSOLIDATION 16-23437) filed by Gonzalez, Luis. Filed By: Gonzalez, Luis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Order - Other (STIPULATIO TO CONSOLIDATE NOT SIGNED. PROPOSED TRANSFER OF CASES TO JUDGE STURGEON SHOULD BE APPROVED BY JUDGE STURGEON) filed by Gonzalez, Luis. Filed By: Gonzalez, Luis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (STIPULATIO TO CONSOLIDATE NOT SIGNED. PROPOSED TRANSFER OF CASES TO JUDGE STURGEON SHOULD BE APPROVED BY JUDGE STURGEON) filed by Gonzalez, Luis. Filed By: Gonzalez, Luis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
86 More Docket Entries
  • 03/09/2016
  • Demurrer / Motion to Strike scheduled for 05/06/2016 at 01:30:00 PM at North County in N-29 Robert P Dahlquist.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • Demurrer / Motion to Strike scheduled for 05/06/2016 at 01:30:00 PM at North County in N-29 Robert P Dahlquist.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Amendment to Complaint filed by Gonzalez, Imelda; Hergenroeather, James E; Hergenroeather, Janet Garfinkel; Raimo, Jennifer; Raimo, Larry; Gonzalez, Luis. Refers to: San Diego Country Estates Association Filed By: Gonzalez, Imelda (Plaintiff); Hergenroeather, James E (Plaintiff); Hergenroeather, Janet Garfinkel (Plaintiff); Raimo, Jennifer (Plaintiff); Raimo, Larry (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2015
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/13/2016 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-29 Robert P Dahlquist.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2015
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Dahlquist, Robert.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2015
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Gonzalez, Luis; Gonzalez, Imelda; Hergenroeather, Janet Garfinkel; Hergenroeather, James E; Raimo, Larry; Raimo, Jennifer. Refers to: San Diego Country Estates Association; San Diego Gas and Electric; Sweitzer, Ralph Filed By: Gonzalez, Luis (Plaintiff); Gonzalez, Imelda (Plaintiff); Hergenroeather, Janet Garfinkel (Plaintiff); Hergenroeather, James E (Plaintiff); Raimo, Larry (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Gonzalez, Luis; Gonzalez, Imelda; Hergenroeather, Janet Garfinkel; Hergenroeather, James E; Raimo, Larry; Raimo, Jennifer. Refers to: San Diego Country Estates Association; San Diego Gas and Electric; Sweitzer, Ralph Filed By: Gonzalez, Luis (Plaintiff); Gonzalez, Imelda (Plaintiff); Hergenroeather, Janet Garfinkel (Plaintiff); Hergenroeather, James E (Plaintiff); Raimo, Larry (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by Gonzalez, Luis; Gonzalez, Imelda; Hergenroeather, Janet Garfinkel; Hergenroeather, James E; Raimo, Larry; Raimo, Jennifer. Refers to: San Diego Country Estates Association; San Diego Gas and Electric; Sweitzer, Ralph Filed By: Gonzalez, Luis (Plaintiff); Gonzalez, Imelda (Plaintiff); Hergenroeather, Janet Garfinkel (Plaintiff); Hergenroeather, James E (Plaintiff); Raimo, Larry (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.