Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 02/25/2021 at 10:43:52 (UTC).

Gonzalez Quiroz VS Coffman Specialties Inc

Case Summary

On 07/01/2020 Gonzalez Quiroz filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Coffman Specialties Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Katherine Bacal. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Katherine Bacal

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gonzalez Quiroz, Jose Refugio

Defendant

Coffman Specialties Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Hyun, Daniel J.

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF DANIEL J HYUN

DAILY, JUSTIN E D

Song, Shelly D

Aljian, Reed T.

Defendant Attorney

Fahimi, Khatereh S.

Attorney at LITTLER MENDELSON P C

 

Court Documents

Order Remanding Case to Originating Court

Order Remanding Case to Originating Court (FILED BY US DISTRICT COURT) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/25/2021 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-69 Katherine Bacal.

Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants filed by Gonzalez Quiroz, Jose Refugio.

First Amended Class and Representative Action Complaint

Amended Complaint (First) filed by Gonzalez Quiroz, Jose Refugio. Refers to: Coffman Specialties Inc

Notice of Removal to Federal Court

Notice of Removal to Federal Court filed by Coffman Specialties Inc.

Proof of Service-electronic

Proof of Service (NOTICE OF REMOVAL) filed by Coffman Specialties Inc.

Complaint

Complaint filed by Gonzalez Quiroz, Jose Refugio. Refers to: Coffman Specialties Inc

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Gonzalez Quiroz, Jose Refugio. Refers to: Coffman Specialties Inc

Summons

Original Summons filed by Gonzalez Quiroz, Jose Refugio. Refers to: Coffman Specialties Inc

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-69; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/25/2021 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-69 Katherine Bacal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Remanding Case to Originating Court (FILED BY US DISTRICT COURT) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/30/2021 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-69 Katherine Bacal was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court filed by Coffman Specialties Inc. Filed By: Coffman Specialties Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service (NOTICE OF REMOVAL) filed by Coffman Specialties Inc. Filed By: Coffman Specialties Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants filed by Gonzalez Quiroz, Jose Refugio. Filed By: Gonzalez Quiroz, Jose Refugio (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Complaint (First) filed by Gonzalez Quiroz, Jose Refugio. Refers to: Coffman Specialties Inc Filed By: Gonzalez Quiroz, Jose Refugio (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/30/2021 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-69 Katherine Bacal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Gonzalez Quiroz, Jose Refugio. Refers to: Coffman Specialties Inc Filed By: Gonzalez Quiroz, Jose Refugio (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Gonzalez Quiroz, Jose Refugio. Refers to: Coffman Specialties Inc Filed By: Gonzalez Quiroz, Jose Refugio (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Gonzalez Quiroz, Jose Refugio. Refers to: Coffman Specialties Inc Filed By: Gonzalez Quiroz, Jose Refugio (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Bacal, Katherine.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COFFMAN SPECIALTIES, INC . is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FAHIMI KHATEREH