This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 12/05/2021 at 09:11:08 (UTC).

Gonzales VS San Diego Housing Commission

Case Summary

On 07/07/2021 Gonzales filed an Other lawsuit against San Diego Housing Commission. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Timothy Taylor. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Timothy Taylor

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GONZALES, SUSAN A

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant

San Diego Housing Commission

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Christensen, Charles B

Attorney at CHRISTENSEN & SPATH LLP

550 W C Street 1660

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other filed by GONZALES, SUSAN A.

Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number

Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by San Diego Housing Commission.

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other filed by GONZALES, SUSAN A.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by San Diego Housing Commission.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by San Diego Housing Commission.

Notice to Filing Party SD

[A document for ROA# 27]

Notice to Filing Party SD

Proof of Service by Mail submitted by San Diego Housing Commission rejected on 12/01/2021.

Notice to Filing Party SD

Complaint submitted by GONZALES, SUSAN A rejected on 12/01/2021.

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other (Claim Not Timely Filed and Reasons) filed by GONZALES, SUSAN A.

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other filed by GONZALES, SUSAN A.

[Another document for ROA# 11]

[Another document for ROA# 11]

ADR Packet generated.

ADR Packet generated.

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other filed by GONZALES, SUSAN A.

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other (Letter and Supporting Documents) filed by GONZALES, SUSAN A.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by GONZALES, SUSAN A.

Demurrer

Demurrer filed by San Diego Housing Commission.

Request for Judicial Notice

Request for Judicial Notice filed by San Diego Housing Commission.

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other (of Joel B Mason in Support of Defendant's Demurrer) filed by San Diego Housing Commission.

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-72; Event Type: Demurrer / Motion to Strike

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-72; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[A document for ROA# 27]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement submitted by San Diego Housing Commission rejected on 12/01/2021. Filed By: San Diego Housing Commission (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail submitted by San Diego Housing Commission rejected on 12/01/2021. Filed By: San Diego Housing Commission (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint submitted by GONZALES, SUSAN A rejected on 12/01/2021. Filed By: GONZALES, SUSAN A (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by San Diego Housing Commission. Filed By: San Diego Housing Commission (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by San Diego Housing Commission. Filed By: San Diego Housing Commission (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other filed by GONZALES, SUSAN A. Filed By: GONZALES, SUSAN A (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by San Diego Housing Commission. Filed By: San Diego Housing Commission (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other filed by GONZALES, SUSAN A. Filed By: GONZALES, SUSAN A (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by GONZALES, SUSAN A. Refers to: San Diego Housing Commission Filed By: GONZALES, SUSAN A (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by GONZALES, SUSAN A. Filed By: GONZALES, SUSAN A (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 12/10/2021 at 09:45:00 AM at Central in C-72 Timothy Taylor.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Granted) filed by GONZALES, SUSAN A. Filed By: GONZALES, SUSAN A (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (for bed bugs infestation no alert document on new methods) filed by GONZALES, SUSAN A. Refers to: San Diego Housing Commission Filed By: GONZALES, SUSAN A (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Taylor, Timothy.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees filed by GONZALES, SUSAN A. Filed By: GONZALES, SUSAN A (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where San Diego Housing Commission is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christensen, Charles B