This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 06/14/2020 at 01:40:39 (UTC).

Gomez vs Hilton Worldwide Inc

Case Summary

On 12/04/2018 Gomez filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against Hilton Worldwide Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOEL R. WOHLFEIL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

JOEL R. WOHLFEIL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GOMEZ, MARIA

Defendants

HILTON WORLDWIDE INC

Park Hotels & Resorts Inc

HLT Conrad Domestic LLC; ESA : Park Hotels & Resorts Inc;ESA : Hilton Worldwide Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HEWGILL, JUSTIN

Attorney at THE LAW OFFICE OF HEWGILL & COBB

1620 Fifth Ave #325

San Diego, CA 92101

COBB, EFAON

Attorney at HEWGRILL COBB & LOCKARD APC

1620 Fifth Ave #325

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant Attorney

Gemelli, Kelly D.

Attorney at JACKSON LEWIS P C

225 Broadway Suite 2000

Chula Vista, CA 91910

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing SD

Status Conference (Civil) scheduled for 06/12/2020 at 02:00:00 PM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil was vacated.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Status Conference (Civil) heard 12/13/2019 02:00:00 PM.

Defendant HLT Conrad Domestic LLC's (erroneously sued as Park Hotels & Resorts Inc and Hilton Worldwide, Inc.) Answer to Plaintiff Maria Gomez's Complaint for Damages

Answer filed by Park Hotels & Resorts Inc.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Park Hotels & Resorts Inc.

Notice of Change of Firm Name

Notice of Change of Firm Name filed by Gomez, Maria.

Notice of Hearing SD

Status Conference (Civil) scheduled for 12/13/2019 at 02:00:00 PM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil.

Joint Stipulation for Binding Arbitration and to Stay Action; [Proposed] Order

Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (Joint Stipulation for Binding Arbitration and to Stay Action; Order) filed by HLT Conrad Domestic LLC; Gomez, Maria.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by HLT Conrad Domestic LLC.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Gomez, Maria.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Gomez, Maria.

Amendment to Complaint

Amendment to Complaint filed by Gomez, Maria. Refers to: Park Hotels & Resorts Inc

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Gomez, Maria. Refers to: Park Hotels & Resorts Inc

Complaint

Complaint filed by Gomez, Maria. Refers to: Hilton Worldwide Inc

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Gomez, Maria. Refers to: Hilton Worldwide Inc

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Gomez, Maria. Refers to: Hilton Worldwide Inc

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

Case initiation form printed.

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus Conference (Civil) scheduled for 06/12/2020 at 02:00:00 PM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketStatus Conference (Civil) continued pursuant to Court's motion to 06/12/2020 at 02:00PM before Judge Joel R. Wohlfeil.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Status Conference (Civil) heard 12/13/2019 02:00:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/10/2019 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus Conference (Civil) scheduled for 12/13/2019 at 02:00:00 PM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Gomez, Maria. Filed By: Gomez, Maria (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Gomez, Maria. Filed By: Gomez, Maria (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation - Other - Fee Due (Joint Stipulation for Binding Arbitration and to Stay Action; Order) filed by HLT Conrad Domestic LLC; Gomez, Maria. Filed By: HLT Conrad Domestic LLC (Defendant); Gomez, Maria (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by HLT Conrad Domestic LLC. Filed By: HLT Conrad Domestic LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Firm Name filed by Gomez, Maria. Filed By: Gomez, Maria (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Park Hotels & Resorts Inc. Filed By: HLT Conrad Domestic LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Gomez, Maria. Refers to: HLT Conrad Domestic LLC Filed By: Gomez, Maria (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint filed by Gomez, Maria. Refers to: HLT Conrad Domestic LLC Filed By: Gomez, Maria (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/10/2019 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Gomez, Maria. Refers to: HLT Conrad Domestic LLC Filed By: Gomez, Maria (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Gomez, Maria. Refers to: HLT Conrad Domestic LLC Filed By: Gomez, Maria (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Gomez, Maria. Refers to: HLT Conrad Domestic LLC Filed By: Gomez, Maria (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Wohlfeil, Joel.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HLT Conrad Domestic Employer LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where HILTON WORLDWIDE HOLDINGS INC is a litigant