This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 02/19/2019 at 23:49:05 (UTC).

Gomez v Pla-ART International Inc

Case Summary

On 01/22/2016 Gomez filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Pla-ART International Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JUDITH F. HAYES and Richard S. Whitney. The case status is Pending - Trial.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Trial

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judges

JUDITH F. HAYES

Richard S. Whitney

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

GOMEZ, GUILLERMO

GR INLAND INC

ALICE COMMERCIAL INC

SAN DIEGO LOGISTICS LLC

PLANT III, FRANK EDWARD

PLA-ART INTERNATIONAL INC; DBA : SAN DIEGO COLD STORAGE

CHAVEZ, MIGUEL

PLA-ART INTERNATIONAL INC

GRINLAND LOGISTICS INC

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

PLA-ART INTERNATIONAL INC; DBA : SAN DIEGO COLD STORAGE INC

PLANT III, FRANK E

SAN DIEGO LOGISTICS LLC

PLANT III, FRANK EDWARD

PLA-ART INTERNATIONAL INC; DBA : SAN DIEGO COLD STORAGE

CHAVEZ, MIGUEL

PLANT III, FRANK EDWARD; AKA : PLANT, FRANK E

PLANT JR, FRANK EDWARD; ESA : PLANT, EDWARD FRANK

PLA-ART INTERNATIONAL INC

9 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

HAVIRD, PAMELA E

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF PAMELA E HAVIRD

P O Box 375

La Jolla, CA 92038-0375

ELLIOTT, RICHARD J

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

9340 Fuerte Dr Suite 300B

La Mesa, CA 91941

GENTES, STEPHEN A

Attorney at GENTES & ASSOCIATES

2385 Shelter Island Drive 203

San Diego, CA 92106-3125

RISSO, SARAH E

2385 Shelter Island Drive Suite 203

San Diego, CA 92106

ANGERT, MARK

Attorney at SOLOMON WARD SEIDENWURM & SMITH LLP

401 B Street 1200

San Diego, CA 92101

HUSTON, PAUL

Attorney at SOLOMON WARD SEIDENWURM & SMITH LLP

Wells Fargo Plaza, 401 B St

San Diego, CA 92101

Cross Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

GENTES, STEPHEN A

Attorney at GENTES & ASSOCIATES

2385 Shelter Island Drive 203

San Diego, CA 92106-3125

RISSO, SARAH E

2385 Shelter Island Drive Suite 203

San Diego, CA 92106

ANGERT, MARK

Attorney at SOLOMON WARD SEIDENWURM & SMITH LLP

401 B Street 1200

San Diego, CA 92101

HUSTON, PAUL

Attorney at SOLOMON WARD SEIDENWURM & SMITH LLP

Wells Fargo Plaza, 401 B St

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

Notice of Lodgment in Support of Defendants' Demurrer and Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Revised Fourth Amended Complaint

Notice of Lodgment filed by Plant, Frank Edward III; PLA-ART International Inc; San Diego Logistics LLC.

Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail filed by Chavez, Miguel.

Defendants' Objection to Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application for an Order Shortenting Time for Motion Hearings

Objections filed by Plant, Frank Edward III; Plant, Frank Edward Jr; PLA-ART International Inc; San Diego Logistics LLC.

Notice of Lodgment

Notice of Lodgment filed by Chavez, Miguel.

Opposition - Other

Opposition - Other (to motion to strike portions of cross-defendant's cross-complaint) filed by Gomez, Guillermo; GR Inland Inc.

Opposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations

Opposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations (MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF FAC) filed by Gomez, Guillermo; GR Inland Inc.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 01/13/2017 10:00:00 AM.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendants' Joint and Several Demurrer to Plaintiffs' Revised Fourth Amended Complaint

Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Plant, Frank Edward III; PLA-ART International Inc; San Diego Logistics LLC.

Complaint for Money Damages

[A document for ROA# 19]

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Gomez, Guillermo.

Declaration of Mark Angert ISO Miguel Chavez' Demurrer to SAC;

Declaration - Other (Declaration of Mark Angert) filed by Chavez, Miguel.

Motion for Protective Order

Motion for Protective Order (with Supporting Documents) filed by PLA-ART International Inc; San Diego Logistics LLC; Plant, Frank Edward Jr; Plant, Frank Edward III.

Amended Complaint

Amended Complaint (1st) filed by Gomez, Guillermo; GR Inland Inc. Refers to: PLA-ART International Inc; San Diego Logistics LLC; Plant, Frank; Chavez, Miguel; Plant, Frank

Deft. Miguel Chavez' Reply ISO His Motion to Strike Portions of the SAC;

Reply to Opposition of Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations filed by Chavez, Miguel.

Proof of Service by Mail Re: M. Chavez Joinder Re Motion to Strike

Proof of Service by Mail filed by Chavez, Miguel.

Motion to Strike

Motion to Strike (Portions O First Amended Complaint (Supporting Documents)) filed by PLA-ART International Inc; San Diego Logistics LLC.

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by Gomez, Guillermo. Refers to: Plant, Frank

Defendant Miguel Chavez's Notice of Joinder and Joinder to Defendants' Motion for Order Granting Judgment on Pleadings

Joinder to Motion and Supporting Declarations filed by Chavez, Miguel.

259 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2019
  • Summary Judgment / Summary Adjudication (Civil) scheduled for 03/14/2019 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-68 Richard S. Whitney.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • The Summary Judgment / Summary Adjudication (Civil) was rescheduled to 03/14/2019 at 10:30:00 AM in C-68 before Richard S. Whitney at Central.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Lodgment (OPPO TO MOTION TO COMPEL AND NOTICE OF LODGMENT TO JOINDER TO MSJ) submitted by Pla-Art International Inc rejected on 01/04/2019. Filed By: Pla-Art International Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service (MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESP AS TO PLA ART INTERNATIONAL) filed by Gomez, Guillermo. Refers to: Pla-Art International Inc Filed By: Gomez, Guillermo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service (MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESP TO 2ND REQ AS TO SAN DIEGO LOGISTICS) filed by Gomez, Guillermo. Refers to: San Diego Logistics LLC Filed By: Gomez, Guillermo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Discovery Hearing scheduled for 04/05/2019 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-68 Richard S. Whitney.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • The Discovery Hearing was rescheduled to 04/05/2019 at 10:30:00 AM in C-68 before Richard S. Whitney at Central.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Discovery Hearing scheduled for 04/05/2019 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-68 Richard S. Whitney.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • The Discovery Hearing was rescheduled to 04/05/2019 at 10:30:00 AM in C-68 before Richard S. Whitney at Central.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Tentative Ruling for Discovery Hearing published.

    Read MoreRead Less
404 More Docket Entries
  • 09/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice - Other (of CMC Hearing in Dept 68 on 10-21-16 to Consolidate and or Coordinate Cases) filed by Gomez, Guillermo. Filed By: Gomez, Guillermo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration - Other (of Guillermo Gomez re Status of Service of Complaint and Failure to Serve Within Sixty Days) filed by Gomez, Guillermo. Filed By: Gomez, Guillermo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 09/09/2016 10:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2016
  • Civil Case Management Conference continued pursuant to party's motion to 10/21/2016 at 10:00AM before Judge Judith F. Hayes.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration - Other (re status of service of complaint and failure to serve within 60 days) filed by Gomez, Guillermo. Filed By: Gomez, Guillermo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 09/09/2016 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-68 Judith F. Hayes.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2016
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Hayes, Judith.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Gomez, Guillermo; GR Inland Inc. Refers to: PLA-ART International Inc; San Diego Logistics LLC; Plant, Frank Filed By: Gomez, Guillermo (Plaintiff); GR Inland Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by Gomez, Guillermo; GR Inland Inc. Refers to: PLA-ART International Inc; San Diego Logistics LLC; Plant, Frank Filed By: Gomez, Guillermo (Plaintiff); GR Inland Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.