This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 11/29/2021 at 11:13:05 (UTC).

Goldman Sachs Bank USA vs Hutchinson

Case Summary

On 01/20/2021 Goldman Sachs Bank USA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Hutchinson. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judges overseeing this case are James A Mangione and Richard E. L. Strauss. The case status is Other - Stayed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judges

James A Mangione

Richard E. L. Strauss

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Goldman Sachs Bank USA

Defendant

Hutchinson, Eric

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jun, Eric

Attorney at ZWICKER & ASSOCIATES P C

700 N Central Ave Suite 500

Glendale, CA 91203

Defendant Attorney

Harutyunyan, Shahane

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF ROBERT S GITMEID PC

2310 Lillyvale Avenue 126

Los Angeles, CA 90032

 

Court Documents

Notice of Change in Handling Attorney

Notice of Change in Handling Attorney filed by Hutchinson, Eric.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Hutchinson, Eric.

of Sarah Lee RE Late Filing of Case Management Statement

Declaration - Other (of Sarah Lee RE Late Filing of Case Ma) filed by Hutchinson, Eric.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Hutchinson, Eric.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 07/23/2021 10:15:00 AM.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Hutchinson, Eric.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Hutchinson, Eric.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Goldman Sachs Bank USA.

Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Goldman Sachs Bank USA.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 09/10/2021 10:00:00 AM.

Notice of Dismissal by Court SD

Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from Strauss,Richard to Mangione,James effective 10/30/2021

Declaration of Non-Service

Declaration of Non-Service filed by Goldman Sachs Bank USA. Refers to: Hutchinson, Eric

Answer

Answer filed by Hutchinson, Eric.

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from C-61 to Richard Strauss effective 02/24/2021

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/23/2021 at 10:15:00 AM at Central in C-75 Richard E. L. Strauss.

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Goldman Sachs Bank USA. Refers to: Hutchinson, Eric

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Goldman Sachs Bank USA. Refers to: Hutchinson, Eric

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase reassigned from Strauss,Richard to Mangione,James effective 10/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Goldman Sachs Bank USA. Filed By: Goldman Sachs Bank USA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketComplaint Demanding Less than $10,000 dismissed without prejudice as to Hutchinson, Eric .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketComplaint Demanding Less than $10,000 dismissed without prejudice as to Goldman Sachs Bank USA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 09/10/2021 10:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Goldman Sachs Bank USA. Filed By: Goldman Sachs Bank USA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Hutchinson, Eric. Filed By: Hutchinson, Eric (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Hutchinson, Eric. Filed By: Hutchinson, Eric (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference continued pursuant to Court's motion to 09/10/2021 at 10:00AM before Judge Richard E. L. Strauss.

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/23/2021 at 10:15:00 AM at Central in C-75 Richard E. L. Strauss.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase reassigned from C-61 to Richard Strauss effective 02/24/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Hutchinson, Eric. Filed By: Hutchinson, Eric (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service filed by Goldman Sachs Bank USA. Refers to: Hutchinson, Eric Filed By: Goldman Sachs Bank USA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Goldman Sachs Bank USA. Refers to: Hutchinson, Eric Filed By: Goldman Sachs Bank USA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Goldman Sachs Bank USA. Refers to: Hutchinson, Eric Filed By: Goldman Sachs Bank USA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Goldman Sachs Bank USA. Refers to: Hutchinson, Eric Filed By: Goldman Sachs Bank USA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department C-61.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GOLDMAN SACHS BANK USA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HARUTYUNYAN SHAHANE