This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 06/22/2022 at 08:10:37 (UTC).

Goldman Sachs Bank USA NA vs Truong

Case Summary

On 03/24/2022 Goldman Sachs Bank USA NA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Truong. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Goldman Sachs Bank USA NA

Defendant

Truong, Tai

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Arguello, Osmundo

Attorney at ZWICKER & ASSOCIATES P C

700 N Brand Boulevard 500

Glendale, CA 91203

 

Court Documents

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Goldman Sachs Bank USA NA. Refers to: Truong, Tai

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Goldman Sachs Bank USA NA. Refers to: Truong, Tai

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Goldman Sachs Bank USA NA. Refers to: Truong, Tai

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Collections SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Collections SD

Case initiation form printed.

Declaration of Non-Service

Declaration of Non-Service filed by Goldman Sachs Bank USA NA. Refers to: Truong, Tai

Declaration of Non-Service

Declaration of Non-Service filed by Goldman Sachs Bank USA NA. Refers to: Truong, Tai

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service filed by Goldman Sachs Bank USA NA. Refers to: Truong, Tai; Filed By: Goldman Sachs Bank USA NA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service filed by Goldman Sachs Bank USA NA. Refers to: Truong, Tai; Filed By: Goldman Sachs Bank USA NA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Department C-61.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Goldman Sachs Bank USA NA. Refers to: Truong, Tai; Filed By: Goldman Sachs Bank USA NA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Goldman Sachs Bank USA NA. Refers to: Truong, Tai; Filed By: Goldman Sachs Bank USA NA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Goldman Sachs Bank USA NA. Refers to: Truong, Tai; Filed By: Goldman Sachs Bank USA NA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GOLDMAN SACHS BANK USA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Arguello, Osmundo