Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/11/2021 at 09:02:30 (UTC).

GIOVANNONE VS PRIII/BROADSTONE CORONADO LLC

Case Summary

On 10/01/2020 GIOVANNONE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against PRIII/BROADSTONE CORONADO LLC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Eddie C Sturgeon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Eddie C Sturgeon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GIOVANNONE, AMY

Defendants

ALLIANCE COMMUNITIES INC

PRIII/BROADSTONE CORONADO LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Thompson, Anthony D

Attorney at THOMPSON INJURY LAW

Defendant Attorney

VOSS, TARA B

 

Court Documents

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANTS PRIII BROADSTONE CORONADO LLC AND ALLIANCE COMMUNITIES INC

Answer filed by ALLIANCE COMMUNITIES INC; PRIII/BROADSTONE CORONADO LLC.

Complaint

Complaint filed by GIOVANNONE, AMY. Refers to: PRIII/BROADSTONE CORONADO LLC; ALLIANCE COMMUNITIES INC

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by GIOVANNONE, AMY. Refers to: PRIII/BROADSTONE CORONADO LLC; ALLIANCE COMMUNITIES INC

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by GIOVANNONE, AMY. Refers to: PRIII/BROADSTONE CORONADO LLC; ALLIANCE COMMUNITIES INC

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

Case initiation form printed.

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 8]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 8]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-67; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by ALLIANCE COMMUNITIES INC; PRIII/BROADSTONE CORONADO LLC. Filed By: ALLIANCE COMMUNITIES INC (Defendant); PRIII/BROADSTONE CORONADO LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/20/2021 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-67 Eddie C Sturgeon.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by GIOVANNONE, AMY. Refers to: PRIII/BROADSTONE CORONADO LLC; ALLIANCE COMMUNITIES INC Filed By: GIOVANNONE, AMY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by GIOVANNONE, AMY. Refers to: PRIII/BROADSTONE CORONADO LLC; ALLIANCE COMMUNITIES INC Filed By: GIOVANNONE, AMY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by GIOVANNONE, AMY. Refers to: PRIII/BROADSTONE CORONADO LLC; ALLIANCE COMMUNITIES INC Filed By: GIOVANNONE, AMY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Sturgeon, Eddie.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALLIANCE COMMUNITIES INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thompson, Anthony D