This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/17/2020 at 03:49:48 (UTC).

GIMLIN vs NISSAN NORTH AMERICA INC

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 GIMLIN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against NISSAN NORTH AMERICA INC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Katherine Bacal. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Katherine Bacal

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gimlin, Christopher

Defendant

Nissan North America Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Yaghoubzadeh, Kevin

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Gimlin, Christopher. Refers to: Nissan North America Inc

Complaint

Complaint filed by Gimlin, Christopher. Refers to: Nissan North America Inc

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Gimlin, Christopher.

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Gimlin, Christopher.

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2020
  • HearingLocation: C-69; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Gimlin, Christopher. Refers to: Nissan North America Inc Filed By: Gimlin, Christopher (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 09/18/2020 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-69 Katherine Bacal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Gimlin, Christopher. Refers to: Nissan North America Inc Filed By: Gimlin, Christopher (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Gimlin, Christopher. Filed By: Gimlin, Christopher (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Gimlin, Christopher. Filed By: Gimlin, Christopher (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Bacal, Katherine.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.