This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/09/2018 at 00:10:37 (UTC).

Gilda Quiogue vs. Teo Archundia

Case Summary

On 09/28/2009 Gilda Quiogue filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Teo Archundia. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, South County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************D-SC

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

QUIOGUE, GILDA

QUIOGUE, NONIE

Defendant

ARCHUNDIA, TEODULO ; ESA : ARCHUNDIA, TEO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SMITH, THEADORE M

Attorney at LAW OFFICES TED M SMITH

P O Box 80306

San Diego, CA 92138

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 12/07/2009 08:30:00 AM.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Non-compliance with Court Order heard 01/21/2010 08:30:00 AM.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Unlawful Detainer Court Trial heard 10/29/2009 09:00:00 AM.

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 02/23/2010 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from S-02 to William Cannon effective 10/29/2009

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 12/07/2009 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 02/23/2010 08:30:00 AM.

Order to Show Cause (Sanctions) SD

Non-compliance with Court Order scheduled for 01/21/2010 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

Notice of Hearing SD

Unlawful Detainer Court Trial scheduled for 10/29/2009 at 09:00:00 AM at South County in S-02 .

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/01/2018
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver, filed by Archundia, Teodulo, on 10/07/2009, has expired.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 02/23/2010 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2010
  • Court ordered entire action dismissed without prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2010
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 02/23/2010 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2010
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 02/23/2010 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 02/23/2010 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2010
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 02/23/2010 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2010
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 02/23/2010 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Non-compliance with Court Order heard 01/21/2010 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Non-compliance with Court Order scheduled for 01/21/2010 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 10/15/2009
  • Request to Set Case for Trial (At Issue Memorandum) filed by Quiogue, Gilda; Quiogue, Nonie.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2009
  • Request for Entry of Default of Unnamed Tenants filed by Quiogue, Gilda.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2009
  • Proof of Service of 5-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Quiogue, Gilda.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2009
  • Answer filed by Archundia, Teodulo. Refers to: Quiogue, Nonie; Quiogue, Gilda Filed By: Archundia, Teodulo (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2009
  • Request to Waive Court Fees filed by Archundia, Teodulo. Filed By: Archundia, Teodulo (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2009
  • Case assigned to Department S-02.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2009
  • Original Summons filed by Quiogue, Gilda; Quiogue, Nonie. Refers to: Archundia, Teodulo Filed By: Quiogue, Gilda (Plaintiff); Quiogue, Nonie (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2009
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Quiogue, Gilda; Quiogue, Nonie. Refers to: Archundia, Teodulo Filed By: Quiogue, Gilda (Plaintiff); Quiogue, Nonie (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2009
  • Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Quiogue, Gilda; Quiogue, Nonie. Refers to: Archundia, Teodulo Filed By: Quiogue, Gilda (Plaintiff); Quiogue, Nonie (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2009
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.