This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 12/03/2019 at 01:53:17 (UTC).

George Gowland Trustee of Gowland Family Trust vs NUWI Vistamonte Inc

Case Summary

On 12/07/2018 George Gowland Trustee of Gowland Family Trust filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against NUWI Vistamonte Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RONALD L. STYN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

RONALD L. STYN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CHERISE M GRAVES CO TRUSTEE OF THE SCOTT R GRAVES AND CHERISE M GRAVES FAMILY TRUST

SCOTT R GRAVES CO TRUSTEE OF THE SCOTT R GRAVES AND CHERISE M GRAVES FAMILY TRUST

NGUYEN, TRACY LEE

WALLEN, MICHAEL D

PARRILLO, JOHN J

GARY COOK TRUSTEE OF GARY AND PATRICIA COOK REVOCABLE TRUST

MICHAEL GREER TRUSTEE OF GREER TRUST

BRUCE HOPPAL TRUSTEE OF HOPPAL FAMILY TRUST

PATRICIA COOK TRUSTEE OF GARY AND PATRICIA COOK REVOCABLE TRUST

ORTEGA, ANDREA

HAMACHER, ANDREA

ORTEGA, MIGUEL

NGUYEN, HUNG THANH

WALLEN, AMY L

SUSAN GRAVES TRUSTEE OF SUSAN S GRAVES REVOCABLE TRUST DATED MAY 5 2014

MAUREEN HOPPAL TRUSTEE OF HOPPAL FAMILY TRUST

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

NUWI VISTAMONTE INC

NEW URBAN WEST INC

FIRE SPRINKLER SYSTEM INC

AMERICAN MOLD GUARD INC

51 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

NAUMANN, WILLIAM H

Attorney at THE NAUMANN LAW FIRM PC

10200 Willow Creek Road 150

San Diego, CA 92131

CRAWLEY, AMANDA K

10200 Willow Creek Rd #150

San Diego, CA 92131

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

WOOLFALL, BRIAN D

13985 Stowe Dr

Poway, CA 92064

TITUS, ROBERT B

Attorney at LORBER GREENFIELD & POLITO LLP

13985 Stowe Dr

Poway, CA 92064

Gordon, Gregory H.

1250 Corona Pointe Court 407

Corona, CA 92879

Other Attorneys

Heller, Elliot H

5720 Oberlin Dr

San Diego, CA 92121

MCNEILL, TIMOTHY C

McGhee, Zaida A

Attorney at ANGULO MCGHEE APLC

KNEZ, FRED J

Attorney at KNEZ LAW GROUP LLP

Milionis, George K

Morin, Jennifer A

Attorney at One W City Boulevard

McMahan, Troy D.

Attorney at KING & SPALDING LLP

Bokmuller, Tammara N

Attorney at BOWMAN AND BROOKE LLP

Norris, Suzanne T

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service re Hydro Systems, Inc.

Proof of Service filed by New Urban West Inc; NUWI Vistamonte Inc.

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Multiple

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party (NOT ENTERED) filed by New Urban West Inc; NUWI Vistamonte Inc.

Cross-Defendant, Spears Manufacturing Co.'s Answer to Cross-Complaint of Fire Sprinkler Systems, Inc.

Answer filed by SPEARS MANUFACTURING CO.

Cross-Complaint of Spears Manufacturing Co. for Indemnity, Contribution and Declaratory Relief

Cross-Complaint filed by SPEARS MANUFACTURING CO. Refers to: Fire Sprinkler Systems Inc

Summons on Cross-Complaint

Original Summons filed by SPEARS MANUFACTURING CO.

NIBCO Inc's Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by NIBCO INC.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Status Conference (Civil) heard 11/08/2019 10:30:00 AM.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.

NIBCO INC.'s Answer to Cross Complaint

Answer filed by NIBCO INC.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by New Urban West Inc; NUWI Vistamonte Inc.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by New Urban West Inc; NUWI Vistamonte Inc.

Defendant The Lubrizol Corporation's Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by The Lubrizol Corporation.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by VIKING GROUP INC; VIKING SUPPLYNET.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Petersen-Dean Inc.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Fire Sprinkler Systems Inc.

Answer

Answer filed by Supply Network, Inc..

Answer to Fire Sprinkler Systems Cross Complaint

Answer filed by VIKING GROUP INC.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Fire Sprinkler Systems Inc. Refers to: NIBCO INC

82 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by New Urban West Inc; NUWI Vistamonte Inc. Filed By: New Urban West Inc (Cross - Complainant); NUWI Vistamonte Inc (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by SPEARS MANUFACTURING CO. Filed By: SPEARS MANUFACTURING CO (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCross-Complaint filed by SPEARS MANUFACTURING CO. Refers to: Fire Sprinkler Systems Inc Filed By: SPEARS MANUFACTURING CO (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by SPEARS MANUFACTURING CO. Filed By: SPEARS MANUFACTURING CO (Cross - Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party (NOT ENTERED) filed by New Urban West Inc; NUWI Vistamonte Inc. Filed By: New Urban West Inc (Cross - Complainant); NUWI Vistamonte Inc (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Status Conference (Civil) heard 11/08/2019 10:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketStatus Conference (Civil) continued pursuant to Court's motion to 03/27/2020 at 10:30AM before Judge Ronald L. Styn.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by NIBCO INC. Filed By: NIBCO INC (Cross - Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Fire Sprinkler Systems Inc. Filed By: Fire Sprinkler Systems Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
81 More Docket Entries
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCross-Complaint filed by Fire Sprinkler System Inc. Refers to: NUWI Vistamonte Inc; New Urban West Inc; American Mold Guard Inc; The Lubrizol Corporation; NIBCO INC; SPEARS MANUFACTURING CO; VIKING GROUP INC; VIKING SUPPLYNET; AMERICAN MOLD GUARD FRANCHISE INC; The Lubrizol Corporation; NIBCO INC; SPEARS MANUFACTURING CO; VIKING GROUP INC; VIKING SUPPLYNET; AMERICAN MOLD GUARD FRANCHISE INC; NIBCO INC Filed By: Fire Sprinkler Systems Inc (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Fire Sprinkler System Inc. Filed By: Fire Sprinkler Systems Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by New Urban West Inc; NUWI Vistamonte Inc. Filed By: New Urban West Inc (Defendant); NUWI Vistamonte Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/10/2019 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-74 Ronald L. Styn.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Styn, Ronald.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by George Gowland Trustee of the Gowland Family Trust; Gary Cook Trustee of Gary and Patricia Cook Revocable Trust; Debbie Gowland Trustee of the Gowland Family Trust; Patricia Cook Trustee of Gary and Patricia Cook Revocable Trust; Susan Graves Trustee of Susan S Graves Revocable Trust Dated May 5 2014; Hamacher, Andrea; Nguyen, Hung Thanh; Nguyen, Tracy Lee; Parrillo, John J; Parrillo, Marlyn;OTHERS. Refers to: NUWI Vistamonte Inc; New Urban West Inc; American Mold Guard Inc; Fire Sprinkler Systems Inc Filed By: George Gowland Trustee of the Gowland Family Trust (Plaintiff); Gary Cook Trustee of Gary and Patricia Cook Revocable Trust (Plaintiff); Debbie Gowland Trustee of the Gowland Family Trust (Plaintiff); Patricia Cook Trustee of Gary and Patricia Cook Revocable Trust (Plaintiff); Susan Graves Trustee of Susan S Graves Revocable Trust Dated May 5 2014 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by George Gowland Trustee of the Gowland Family Trust; Gary Cook Trustee of Gary and Patricia Cook Revocable Trust; Debbie Gowland Trustee of the Gowland Family Trust; Patricia Cook Trustee of Gary and Patricia Cook Revocable Trust; Susan Graves Trustee of Susan S Graves Revocable Trust Dated May 5 2014; Hamacher, Andrea; Nguyen, Hung Thanh; Nguyen, Tracy Lee; Parrillo, John J; Parrillo, Marlyn;OTHERS. Refers to: NUWI Vistamonte Inc; New Urban West Inc; American Mold Guard Inc; Fire Sprinkler Systems Inc Filed By: George Gowland Trustee of the Gowland Family Trust (Plaintiff); Gary Cook Trustee of Gary and Patricia Cook Revocable Trust (Plaintiff); Debbie Gowland Trustee of the Gowland Family Trust (Plaintiff); Patricia Cook Trustee of Gary and Patricia Cook Revocable Trust (Plaintiff); Susan Graves Trustee of Susan S Graves Revocable Trust Dated May 5 2014 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by George Gowland Trustee of the Gowland Family Trust; Gary Cook Trustee of Gary and Patricia Cook Revocable Trust; Debbie Gowland Trustee of the Gowland Family Trust; Patricia Cook Trustee of Gary and Patricia Cook Revocable Trust; Susan Graves Trustee of Susan S Graves Revocable Trust Dated May 5 2014; Hamacher, Andrea; Nguyen, Hung Thanh; Nguyen, Tracy Lee; Parrillo, John J; Parrillo, Marlyn;OTHERS. Refers to: NUWI Vistamonte Inc; New Urban West Inc; American Mold Guard Inc; Fire Sprinkler Systems Inc; Sleiman, Antione; Sleiman, Maggie; Walker, David; Walker, Catherine Filed By: George Gowland Trustee of the Gowland Family Trust (Plaintiff); Gary Cook Trustee of Gary and Patricia Cook Revocable Trust (Plaintiff); Debbie Gowland Trustee of the Gowland Family Trust (Plaintiff); Patricia Cook Trustee of Gary and Patricia Cook Revocable Trust (Plaintiff); Susan Graves Trustee of Susan S Graves Revocable Trust Dated May 5 2014 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NEW URBAN WEST INC is a litigant

Latest cases where GRUEN TRUST is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN MOLD GUARD INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where FIRE SPRINKLERS SYSTEMS, INC is a litigant