This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/16/2018 at 08:43:18 (UTC).

George Chermak vs. Southwest Pipeline and Trenchless Corp

Case Summary

On 02/28/2017 George Chermak filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Southwest Pipeline and Trenchless Corp. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOEL R. WOHLFEIL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

JOEL R. WOHLFEIL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHERMAK, GEORGE

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

SOUTHWEST PIPELINE AND TRENCHLESS CORP

CITY OF SAN DIEGO

TOM SCANLAN; DBA : T L SCANLAN CONSTRUCTION SERVICES;ESA : TL SCANLAN CONSTRUCTION INC

EASY FLOW LLC

Cross Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

TL SCANLAN CONSTRUCTION INC

TOM SCANLAN; DBA : T L SCANLAN CONSTRUCTION SERVICES;ESA : TL SCANLAN CONSTRUCTION INC

EASY FLOW LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VAN ORDER, WILLIAM R

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF WILLIAM R VAN ORDER P C

145 S Carmalita St

Hemet, CA 92543

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

FARMER, JOHN T

Attorney at FARMER CASE & FEDOR

402 W Broadway 1100

San Diego, CA 92101

KENNEDY, KEVIN P.

1230 Columbia Street 600

San Diego, CA 92101

KENNY, EUGENE P

Attorney at GRIMM VRANJES & GREER LLP

550 West C Street 1100

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Chermak, George. Refers to: City of San Diego

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Chermak, George. Refers to: Tom Scanlan

Answer

Answer filed by Southwest Pipeline And Trenchless Corp.

Summons to Cross-Complaint

Original Summons (Cross Complaint) filed by Southwest Pipeline And Trenchless Corp. Refers to: Tom Scanlan

Cross-Complaint

Cross-Complaint filed by Southwest Pipeline And Trenchless Corp. Refers to: Tom Scanlan; Easy Flow LLC

Defendant, Tom Scanlan, dba TL Scanlan Construction Services' (esa TL Scanlan Construction, Inc.) Answer to Plaintiff, George Chermak's Complaint and POS

Answer filed by Tom Scanlan.

Defendant, Tom Scanlan, dba TL Scanlan Construction Services' (esa TL Scanlan Construction, Inc.) Notice of Demand for Trial by Jury and Notice of Advanced Jury Fee Deposit and POS

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Tom Scanlan.

Defendant, Tom Scanlan, dba TL Scanlan Construction Services' (esa TL Scanlan Construction, Inc.) Jeld-Wen, Inc. v. Superior Court Objection and POS

Objections filed by Tom Scanlan.

Summons to MOE Cross-Complaint by TOM SCANLAN, dba TL SCANLAN CONSTRUCTION SERVICES ETC.

Original Summons (Cross Complaint) filed by Tom Scanlan.

MOE Cross-Complaint of TOM SCANLAN, dba TL SCANLAN CONSTRUCTION SERVICES (esa TL SCANLAN CONSTRUCTION, INC.) and POS

Cross-Complaint filed by Tom Scanlan. Refers to: Easy Flow LLC

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Chermak, George. Refers to: Southwest Pipeline And Trenchless Corp

Answer

Answer filed by City of San Diego.

Cross-Complaint

Cross-Complaint filed by City of San Diego. Refers to: TL Scanlan Construction Inc; Tom Scanlan; Easy Flow LLC

Original Summons

Original Summons (on Cross Complaint) filed by City of San Diego. Refers to: TL Scanlan Construction Inc

Amendment to Complaint/Cross-Complaint naming Doe

Amendment to Complaint/Cross-Complaint naming Doe (MOE 1) filed by Tom Scanlan. Refers to: Easy Flow LLC

Answer

Answer filed by Tom Scanlan.

Answer

Answer filed by Tom Scanlan.

Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number

Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Tom Scanlan.

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2018
  • DocketCross-Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Easy Flow LLC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • DocketCross-Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Tom Scanlan.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal filed by TL Scanlan Construction Inc. Filed By: TL Scanlan Construction Inc (Cross - Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • DocketStatus of Mediation process changed to Settled at hearing.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Agreement/Nonagreement - full agreement filed by Chermak, George. Filed By: Chermak, George (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • DocketStatus of Mediation process changed to Pending.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMediation Selection Form filed by Southwest Pipeline And Trenchless Corp. Filed By: Southwest Pipeline And Trenchless Corp (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Easy Flow LLC. Filed By: Easy Flow LLC (Cross - Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMediation Selection Form filed by City of San Diego; Southwest Pipeline And Trenchless Corp. Filed By: City of San Diego (Defendant); Southwest Pipeline And Trenchless Corp (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 10/06/2017 02:00:00 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 03/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Chermak, George. Filed By: Chermak, George (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-filing transaction partially accepted.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 7]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 7]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/04/2017 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Wohlfeil, Joel.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Chermak, George. Refers to: Southwest Pipeline And Trenchless Corp; Tom Scanlan; City of San Diego Filed By: Chermak, George (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Chermak, George. Refers to: Southwest Pipeline And Trenchless Corp; Tom Scanlan; City of San Diego; Easy Flow LLC Filed By: Chermak, George (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTHWEST PIPELINE AND TRENCHLESS is a litigant

Latest cases where TL Scanlan Construction Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kenny, Eugene P

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KENNEDY KEVIN P.