This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 11/15/2022 at 07:07:35 (UTC).

Gendelman vs IKEA US Retail LLC

Case Summary

On 09/16/2022 Gendelman filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against IKEA US Retail LLC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory W Pollack. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Gregory W Pollack

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gendelman, Ellen

Defendants

CS Transit Leasing Inc

Sudberry Properties Inc

IKEA NORTH AMERICA SERVICES LLC; ESA : IKEA US Retail LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Quigley, William Brennan

Defendant Attorneys

Berman, Evan A

M.Lenkov,Esq., Jeffery

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint filed by Gendelman, Ellen. Refers to: IKEA US Retail LLC; CS Transit Leasing Inc; Sudberry Properties Inc

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Gendelman, Ellen. Refers to: IKEA US Retail LLC; CS Transit Leasing Inc; Sudberry Properties Inc

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Gendelman, Ellen. Refers to: IKEA US Retail LLC; CS Transit Leasing Inc; Sudberry Properties Inc

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Gendelman, Ellen.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Gendelman, Ellen.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Gendelman, Ellen.

Answer (First Papers)

Answer filed by IKEA NORTH AMERICA SERVICES LLC.

Answer (First Papers)

Answer filed by CS Transit Leasing Inc.

Demand for Jury Trial (Trial/Hearing Setting)

Demand for Jury Trial filed by CS Transit Leasing Inc.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit (Notices)

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by CS Transit Leasing Inc.

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2023
  • HearingLocation: C-71; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by CS Transit Leasing Inc.; Filed By: CS Transit Leasing Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial filed by CS Transit Leasing Inc.; Filed By: CS Transit Leasing Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by CS Transit Leasing Inc.; Filed By: CS Transit Leasing Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by IKEA NORTH AMERICA SERVICES LLC.; Filed By: IKEA NORTH AMERICA SERVICES LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Gendelman, Ellen.; Filed By: Gendelman, Ellen (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Gendelman, Ellen.; Filed By: Gendelman, Ellen (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Gendelman, Ellen.; Filed By: Gendelman, Ellen (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 02/17/2023 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-71 Gregory W Pollack.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Pollack, Gregory.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Gendelman, Ellen. Refers to: IKEA NORTH AMERICA SERVICES LLC; CS Transit Leasing Inc; Sudberry Properties Inc; Filed By: Gendelman, Ellen (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Gendelman, Ellen. Refers to: IKEA NORTH AMERICA SERVICES LLC; CS Transit Leasing Inc; Sudberry Properties Inc; Filed By: Gendelman, Ellen (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Gendelman, Ellen. Refers to: IKEA NORTH AMERICA SERVICES LLC; CS Transit Leasing Inc; Sudberry Properties Inc; Filed By: Gendelman, Ellen (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less